This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 10:17:22 (UTC).

B. v. United Healthcare Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 B filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D. B.

Defendants

United Healthcare Insurance

United Behavioral Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Martinez

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

Ashley Walker

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Martinez on behalf of United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Martinez, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for

#4

(#4) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading) Attorney Ashley Walker added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Walker added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(Walker, Ashley) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/6/21. (alf) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4048840) filed by D. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff D. B. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants' deadline to file a response to the complaint is extended to September 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/30/2021. No attached document. (eh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Martinez on behalf of United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Martinez, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading) Attorney Ashley Walker added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Walker added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(Walker, Ashley) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/6/21. (alf) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4048840) filed by D. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff D. B. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant