This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2019 at 07:29:16 (UTC).

B v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 B filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03004

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R B

Mason, OH 45040

Defendants

Kalyn Cavazos

College Station, TX 77843

Terri Allison

College Station, TX 77843

James Hanson

College Station, TX 77843

Jennifer M Smith

College Station, TX 77843

Candice Lott

College Station, TX 77843

Anne Reber

Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James William Holtz

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2121 Sage Road, Suite 250

Houston, TX 77056

William Wright Holtz

Attorney at Holtz Law Firm

2500 City West Blvd, Ste 300

Houston, TX 77042

Joshua Adam Engel

Attorney at Engel and Martin

4660 Duke Drive, Suite 101

Mason, OH 45040

Anne Tamashasky

Attorney at Engel & Martin, LLC

4660 Duke Drive, Suite 101

Mason, OH 45040

Defendant Attorneys

Henry Carl Myers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th St, 11Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

Cristina Maria Moreno

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548, Capital Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Michael Raphael Abrams

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548, Capital Station

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Proposed Order

#31

#30

#29

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

#27

26 #1

Exhibit Exhibit H

#26

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order For Expedited Limited Discovery

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

2 #1

Affidavit In support of TRO

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Henry Carl Myers terminated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed.(Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Unopposed MOTION for H. Carl Myers to Withdraw as Attorney by Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina M. Moreno on behalf of Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. (Moreno, Cristina) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Engel, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by William Holtz on behalf of R B, filed. (Holtz, William) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of forwarding to all counsel judge's procedures by R B, filed. (Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Anne Tamashasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Certificate of Service re: #1 Complaint by R B, filed. (Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by R B, filed.(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Anne Tamashasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Joshua Engel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION for Discovery by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Expedited Limited Discovery)(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First MOTION To proceed Anonymously by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019.), First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by R B, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of TRO)(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22963093) filed by R B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holtz, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne L Tamashasky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Holtz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A. Engel Esq.