This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:20:40 (UTC).

A.B. v. Salesforce.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 A B filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Salesforce com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01254

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. B.

Defendants

Salesforce.com, Inc.

Backpage.com, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Echols Harris

Attorney at Sico Hoelscher Harris LLP

802 N Caranacahua, Ste 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Lawrence Raiff

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Ave, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Kristin Linsley

Attorney at GIbson Dunn Crutcher LLP

555 Mission St, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Backpage.com, LLC, Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by A. B..(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by A. B., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Harris, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kristin A Linsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Transfer in Related Case by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Kristin A. Linsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2020. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Related Litigation by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#6

(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by A. B..(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by A. B., filed.(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Backpage.com, LLC, Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by A. B..(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by A. B., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Harris, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kristin A Linsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Transfer in Related Case by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Kristin A. Linsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2020. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Related Litigation by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION by Salesforce.com, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raiff, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by A. B..(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by A. B., filed.(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Salesforce.com, Inc., filed.(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24529323) filed by A. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, David) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where backpage.com, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Linsley