This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:35:44 (UTC).

B. v. Columbus Municipal School District et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Columbus Municipal School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K. B.

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Michael Jackson

Columbus Municipal School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lilli Evans Bass

Attorney at BROWN BASS & JETER, PLLC

Post Office Box 22969

Jackson, MS 39225

Defendant Attorneys

Wilton V. Byars, III

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL

P.O. Box 1396

Oxford, MS 38655

Tiffany Nicole Carey

Attorney at DANIEL COKER HORTON & BELL, P.A.

265 N. Lamar Blvd., Suite R

Oxford, MS 38655

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Michael Jackson (jla)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Columbus Municipal School District (Byars, Wilton)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbus Municipal School District. (Carey, Tiffany)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilli Evans Bass on behalf of K. B. Columbus Municipal School District served on 2/22/2019. (Bass, Lilli)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilli Evans Bass on behalf of K. B. Columbus Municipal School District served on 2/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Columbus Municipal School District, Michael Jackson. Forwarded to plaintiff attorney this date. (cr) Modified on 2/6/2019 (jla).

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1638040, filed by K. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Michael Jackson (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Columbus Municipal School District (Byars, Wilton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbus Municipal School District. (Carey, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilli Evans Bass on behalf of K. B. Columbus Municipal School District served on 2/22/2019. (Bass, Lilli)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilli Evans Bass on behalf of K. B. Columbus Municipal School District served on 2/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Columbus Municipal School District, Michael Jackson. Forwarded to plaintiff attorney this date. (cr) Modified on 2/6/2019 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1638040, filed by K. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.