This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:58:01 (UTC).

B & H Farming et al v. Syngenta Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 B H Farming filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Syngenta Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00741

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cedar Draw LLC

B & H Farming

Ceres Ag. LLC

Tyche Ag. LLC

Defendants

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Bayer CropScience Incorporated

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Incorporated

GROWMARK, Incorporated

Tenkoz Inc.

CHS Incorporated

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Corteva Incorporated

Syngenta Corporation

Univar Solutions, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Jaylene Hanway

Attorney at FISHER HUDSON SHALLAT

950 West Bannock Street, Suite 630

Boise, ID 83702

Vaughn Fisher

Attorney at Fisher Hudson Shallat

950 West Bannock Street, Suite 630

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorney

Scott J. Smith

Attorney at RACINE OLSON

201 East Center Street

Pocatello, ID 83201

 

Court Documents

29 #1

*Restricted*

#29

28 #2

email of Text Only Entry transferring case

28 #1

email reflecting MDL text entry - stay is lifted

#28

#27

#25

#23

#22

1 #15

Summons Winfield Solutions LLC

1 #11

Summons Simplot AB

1 #10

Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions

1 #9

Summons Growmark Inc.

1 #5

Summons Cargill Inc.

1 #4

Summons Bayer CropScience LP

1 #3

Summons Bayer CropScience Inc.

1 #2

Summons BASF Corp.

1 #1

Cover Sheet

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Case transferred in from District of Idaho; Case Number 4:21-cv-00121. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for District of Missouri (Attachments: #1 email reflecting MDL text entry - stay is lifted, #2 email of Text Only Entry transferring case)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER - CTO for MDL No. 2993 (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:21-cv-00121-REP. (jd) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#26) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that due to Judge Bush taking inactive status, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATUS REPORT) by Bayer CropScience Incorporated, Bayer CropScience LP. (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY. The Court HEREBY GRANTS the Joint Motion Regarding Temporary Stay (Dkt. #23 ) and hereby stays all further activity in this case pending the decision of the JPML or further order of the Court. Additionally, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that the parties file a joint status report by the first day of each month, starting with June 1, 2021. Finally, the Court HEREBY DENIES the duplicate Joint Motion to Stay (Dkt. #22 ).IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint MOTION to Stay Scott J. Smith appearing for Defendants Bayer CropScience Incorporated, Bayer CropScience LP. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint MOTION to Stay Scott J. Smith appearing for Defendants Bayer CropScience Incorporated, Bayer CropScience LP. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. Growmark, Incorporated served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. Corteva Incorporated served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. Cargill Incorporated served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. Bayer CropScience LP served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. BASF Corporation served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Ag. LLC, B & H Farming, Tyche Ag. LLC, Cedar Draw LLC. CHS Incorporated served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer CropScience Incorporated, #2 Summons Bayer CropScience LP, #3 Summons Cargill Incorporated, #4 Summons CHS, Incorporated, #5 Summons Corteva Incorporated, #6 Summons Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., #7 Summons GROWMARK, Inc., #8 Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., #9 Summons Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., #10 Summons Syngenta Corporation, #11 Summons Tenkoz, Inc., #12 Summons Univar Solutions, Incorporated, #13 Summons Winfield Solutions, LLC)(kt) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 4:21-cv-00121-REB for all future filings. (kt) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2184708.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BASF Corp., #3 Summons Bayer CropScience Inc., #4 Summons Bayer CropScience LP, #5 Summons Cargill Inc., #6 Summons CHS Inc., #7 Summons Corteva Inc., #8 Summons Federated Co, #9 Summons Growmark Inc., #10 Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions, #11 Summons Simplot AB, #12 Summons Syngenta Corp., #13 Summons Tenkoz Inc., #14 Summons Univar Solutions Inc., #15 Summons Winfield Solutions LLC)(Fisher, Vaughn) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ceres Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WINFIELD SOLUTIONS LLC D/B/A WINFIELD UNITED is a litigant