This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:37:38 (UTC).

B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. v. Anheuser-Busch, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 B Fernandez Hnos , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anheuser-Busch, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B. Fernndez & Hnos., Inc.

B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc.

Defendant

Anheuser-Busch, LLC

One Busch Place

St. Louis, MO 63118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado Fernandez LLC

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Pedro Hernandez-Freire

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910

Defendant Attorneys

Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V

Attorney at Reichard & Escalera

Po Box 364148

San Juan, PR 00936-4148

Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz

P.O. Box 364148

San Juan, PR 00936-4148

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#29

(#29) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 8/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#28

(#28) SURREPLY to Motion in support of Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#27

(#27) REPLY to Motion Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Re: #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE to Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. Re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc.. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 7/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 7/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

5 #1

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Termination Agreement

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of B. Fernndez & Hnos., Inc. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #3

Summons As to Anheuser-Busch, LLC

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: Granting #29 "Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading." Defendant shall respond or otherwise plead not later than August 24, 2022. Unless extreme circumstances beyond defendant's reasonable control dictate otherwise, the court will not grant additional extensions of time. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/21/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 8/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SURREPLY to Motion in support of Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Motion Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Re: #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER: Granting #24 "Motion for Leave to Respond to ECF No. 19." Sur-reply due July 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/1/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE to Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. Re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc.. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 7/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Granting #22 "Motion for Leave to Reply to ECF No. 18." Reply due July 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/29/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 7/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Anheuser-Busch, LLC Responses due by 7/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Unsworn Declaration Under Penalty of Perjucy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Military Sales Representative Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - 5.26.2022 Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 6.17.2022 Letter)(Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Noting #8 "Motion in Compliance with Order." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/14/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service and Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 6 by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. upon Anheuser-Busch, LLC served on 6/13/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro Hernandez-Freire on behalf of B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc. (Hernandez-Freire, Pedro) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: See attached. Service of process in accordance with this order is due by noontime on June 15, 2022. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by June 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/8/2022. (AEM) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez.(Filing Fee $402.00, Receipt Number APRDC-7787664) (arg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of B. Fernndez & Hnos., Inc. Responses due by 6/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Termination Agreement)(Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of B. Fernndez & Hnos., Inc. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Anheuser-Busch, LLC, filed by B. Fernandez & Hnos., Inc.. Service due by 9/6/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons As to Anheuser-Busch, LLC)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 6/8/2022 to correct attachment's description (mcm). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANHEUSER BUSCH COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz