This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:50:50 (UTC).

E.B. et al v. Landry et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 E B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Landry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00862

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E. B.

D. W.

T. R.

Defendants

Jeff Landry

Doug Welborn

Hillar C. Moore, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Elizabeth Orians

Attorney at The First 72+

2915 Perdido St

New Orleans, LA 70119

Phil Telfeyan

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th St. Nw, Suite 602

Washington, D.C., DC 2004

James Davy

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

400 7Th St Nw, Suite 602

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B (Orians Declaration)

17 #1

Attachment Brief in Support

#17

16 #4

Exhibit C: Telfeyan Declaration

16 #3

Exhibit B: Orians Declaration

16 #2

Exhibit A: NCSL Report

16 #1

Brief in Support

#16

#2

1 #7

Attachment Def. Moore Summons

1 #6

Attachment Def. Welborn Summons

1 #5

Attachment Def. Landry Summons

1 #4

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Declaration of T.R.

1 #2

Exhibit Declaration of D.W.

1 #1

Exhibit Declaration of E.B.

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hillar C. Moore, III. Hillar C. Moore, III waiver sent on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Lee, Dale) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Certify Class Two Defendant Classes by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Orians Declaration))(Davy, James) Modified on 1/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass of Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A:NCSL Report, #3 Exhibit B: Orians Declaration, #4 Exhibit C: Telfeyan Declaration)(Davy, James) Modified on 1/24/2020 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 and #14 Amended Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys James P. Davy and Phil Telfeyan are enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Plaintiffs E. B., D. W., and T. R. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Jim Davy to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #14 MOTION for Phil Telfeyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended Motion for Phil Telfeyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Orians, Kelly) Modified on 1/14/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended Motion for Jim Davy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Affidavit)(Orians, Kelly) Modified on 1/14/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER denying #8 Motion for James P. Davy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(8)(B) and (C). The #9 Motion for Phil Telfeyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(8)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Jeff Landry, Hillar C. Moore, III, Doug Welborn. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #2 , #6 and #7 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by T. R.. (KMW) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by D. W.. (KMW) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Jeff Landry, Hillar C. Moore, III, Doug Welborn. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to Attorney Kelly E. Orians regarding Phil Telfeyan and Jim Davy who is Co-Counsel for party E.B., D.W., and T.R.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Orians, Kelly) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by E.B. Modified on 12/18/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by E. B., T. R., D. W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of E.B., #2 Exhibit Declaration of D.W., #3 Exhibit Declaration of T.R., #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Def. Landry Summons, #6 Attachment Def. Welborn Summons, #7 Attachment Def. Moore Summons)(Orians, Kelly) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phil Telfeyan