This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 07:45:34 (UTC).

J.B. v. Charley

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 J B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Charley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J B

K E

J.B.

Defendants

Coach Danny Charley

Danny Charley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Shannon L Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorney

Gerald A. Coppler

Attorney at Coppler Law Firm, P.C.

645 Don Gaspar Avenue

Santa Fe, NM 87505

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER QUASHING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING #6 MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff J.B. shall file, no later than September 1, 2021, an unredacted complaint under seal that places on the record Plaintiff J.B. in her real name as the party in interest. (kfo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Proceed by Pseudonym re #3 Order by J.B.. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER QUASHING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING #6 MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff J.B. shall file, no later than September 1, 2021, an unredacted complaint under seal that places on the record Plaintiff J.B. in her real name as the party in interest. (kfo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Proceed by Pseudonym re #3 Order by J.B.. (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Danny Charley of Agreed Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) (Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7780152 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Danny Charley (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Danny Charley from 13th Judicial District Court, Sandoval County NM, case number D-1329-CV-2021-00892. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Danny Charley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Summons Served, #3 Exhibit C (Civil Cover Sheet))(Coppler, Gerald) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.B. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon L. Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy