This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 08:37:43 (UTC).

B. et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 B filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jared C. Bennett, David Barlow and Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00277

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

Presiding Judges

Jared C. Bennett

David Barlow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly B.

K. B.

Defendant

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorney

Rebecca R. Hanson

Attorney at REED SMITH

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs K. B., Kelly B. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (af) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/22. (alf) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kelly B., K. B. as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois Waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs K. B., Kelly B., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. Form due by 6/10/2022. (alf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/2/2022. (ep) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#8) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#7) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. (alf) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#6) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs K. B., Kelly B.. (alf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs K. B., Kelly B., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. Form due by 6/10/2022. (alf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kelly B., K. B. as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois Waiver sent on 5/13/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/22. (alf) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4314491) filed by Kelly B., K. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs K. B., Kelly B. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (af) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R. Hanson