This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 07:43:48 (UTC).

Azizi v. Jose et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Azizi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela K. Chen and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07134

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamina Azizi

Levittown, NY 11756

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose

Enterprise Rent-A-Car

Ean Holdings

Ean Holdings, LLC

Cross Claimants and Defendants

Enterprise Rent-A-Car

Ean Holdings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul B Youkilis

Attorney at The Youkilis Law Group, P.C.

65 Hilton Avenue

Garden City, NY 11530

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Edward J. Savidge

Attorney at Rankin Savidge PLLC

1527 Franklin Avenue, Ste. 105

Mineola, NY 11501

Peter M. Khrinenko

Attorney at Brand, Glick & Brand, P.C.

90 Merrick Avenue, Suite 203

East Meadow, NY 11554

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Peter M. Khrinenko

Attorney at Brand, Glick & Brand, P.C.

90 Merrick Avenue, Suite 203

East Meadow, NY 11554

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16166475) (Savidge, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose (Savidge, Edward) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose by Ean Holdings, Enterprise Rent-A-Car. (Khrinenko, Peter) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/22/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 12/19/2022. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/1/2022. (MV) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF REMAND TO STATE COURT: For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, this case is remanded to state court because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand this entire action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, under docket number 713734/2022, and terminate this case. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/13/2022. (EK) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTerminating Scheduling Order: The 12/22/2022 Initial Conference is cancelled. See DKT. No. #7 ORDER OF REMAND TO STATE COURT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/13/2022. (MV) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF REMAND TO STATE COURT: For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, this case is remanded to state court because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand this entire action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, under docket number 713734/2022, and terminate this case. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/13/2022. (EK) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/22/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 12/19/2022. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/1/2022. (MV) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose by Ean Holdings, Enterprise Rent-A-Car. (Khrinenko, Peter) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose (Savidge, Edward) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit completed Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Soria Gonzalez De Buitra Jose ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16166475) (Savidge, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter M. Khrinenko