This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 08:15:25 (UTC).

Aziyo Biologics, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Aziyo Biologics, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01456

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aziyo Biologics, Inc.

Defendants

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard I.G. Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Berger Harris, LLP

1105 N. Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Peter C. McGivney

Attorney at Berger Harris, LLP

1105 N. Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Bruce W. McCullough

Attorney at Bodell Bove, LLC

1225 N. King Street, Suite 1000, P.O. Box 397

Wilmington, DE 19899-0397

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

2 #2

Main Document

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #3

Certificate of Service

2 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #5

Exhibit 1

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lam) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Insurance Company for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (lam) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to November 21, 2022 - filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company with prejudice and without costs and as to Defendant McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. without prejudice and without costs (McGivney, Peter) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (dlw) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company with prejudice and without costs and as to Defendant McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. without prejudice and without costs (McGivney, Peter) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 21, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company answer due 11/21/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to November 21, 2022 - filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER: The motion to seal (D.I. #1 ) is DENIED in part. There is no basis for confidentiality other than the fact that the complaint was filed under seal in Superior Court. That is not enough. The complaint is unsealed. The policy may be filed under seal, but unless there are compelling declarations submitted within seven days, justifying limited redactions, the remainder of Exhibit 1 (the contract) will also be unsealed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/4/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketRemark: Exit electronic copies to duty judge (RGA) (lam) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Insurance Company for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (lam) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lam) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #2 Notice of Removal, by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc., Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(lam) Modified on 11/4/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DE Superior Court (Case Number C.A. No. N22C-09- 811 (CCLD)) (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3999120) - filed by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc., Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lam) Modified on 11/4/2022 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2022: #5 Exhibit 1) (nms). (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to File Under Seal - filed by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc., Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lam) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/8/2022) (lam). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less