This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:05:28 (UTC).

AZ Global Enterprises, LLC v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 AZ Global Enterprises, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22545

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZ Global Enterprises, LLC. doing business as Robeks Juice

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

2400 E. Commercial Blvd., Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Massiel C Vazquez

Attorney at Your Insurance Attorney, PPLC

2601 South Bayshore Drive, 18Th Floor

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Maximo Alexander Santiago

Attorney at Marin, Eljaiek, Lopez & Martinez, P.L.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, 18Th Floor

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Ariana Rubio Di Natale

Attorney at Your Insurance Attorney, PLLC

2601 South Bayshore Drive, 18Th Floor

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorney

Michael Adam Packer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, Count II by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/17/2021 (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) Scottdale Insurance Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Count I by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ariana Rubio Di Natale, mailing date July 16, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, Count II by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/17/2021 (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Scottdale Insurance Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Count I by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ariana Rubio Di Natale, mailing date July 16, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14852591, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Docket Sheet Docket, #6 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #7 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #8 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #9 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #10 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #11 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #12 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #13 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket, #14 Docket Sheet State Court - Docket)(Packer, Michael) Modified Text on 7/16/2021 (drz). ( No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss filed in State Court) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER