This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2020 at 09:16:47 (UTC).

Ayuso et al v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Ayuso filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01631

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Ayuso

Juan Ayuso

Defendants

GEICO General Insurance Company

Ebonie Gibbs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Phillip Dollard

Attorney at Leslie Robert Evans & Associates

Suite 200, 214 Brazilian Avenue

Palm Beach, FL 33480

Defendant Attorneys

David Cyril Knapp

Attorney at James A. Coleman, PA

Suite 250, 612 E Colonial Dr

Orlando, FL 32803

Sebastian Camilo Mejia

Attorney at Kubicki Draper

201 S Orange Ave, Suite 475

Orlando, FL 32801

Josue Monrouzeau

One Legal Team Pllc, 111 N Orange Ave, Suite 800

Orlando, FL 32801-2316

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 12/17/2021, All other motions due by 12/30/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 2/1/2022 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/1/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/8/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Knapp, David) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GEICO General Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Knapp, David) Modified docket text on 9/23/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Ebonie Gibbs. (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ebonie Gibbs. Related case(s): yes (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian Camilo Mejia on behalf of Ebonie Gibbs (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ebonie Gibbs.(Mejia, Sebastian) Modified on 9/11/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Elizabeth Ayuso, Juan Ayuso. Related case(s): yes (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Elizabeth Ayuso, Juan Ayuso. (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/9/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/9/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company.(Knapp, David) Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-007403-O Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17269858 filed by Ebonie Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT)(Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#17) CASE REFERRED to Mediation (emailed mediator). (MEJ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 12/17/2021, All other motions due by 12/30/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 2/1/2022 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/1/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/8/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Knapp, David) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GEICO General Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Knapp, David) Modified docket text on 9/23/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Ebonie Gibbs. (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ebonie Gibbs. Related case(s): yes (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian Camilo Mejia on behalf of Ebonie Gibbs (Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ebonie Gibbs.(Mejia, Sebastian) Modified on 9/11/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Elizabeth Ayuso, Juan Ayuso. Related case(s): yes (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Elizabeth Ayuso, Juan Ayuso. (Dollard, Jason) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketREFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17269620 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Rosemarie Silvia.. (NLC) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/9/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/9/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company.(Knapp, David) Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1631-Orl-31EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-007403-O Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17269858 filed by Ebonie Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT)(Mejia, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Cyril Knapp(Designation Retained)