This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 07:54:14 (UTC).

Ayoubi v. Hanesbrands Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Ayoubi filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Hanesbrands Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00954

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Firas M. Ayoubi

Dixon, IL 61021

Defendants

Hanesbrands Inc

Keefe Group LLC

Access Catalogue Co

Fila Sporting Goods Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Alexander Brewster Chosid

Attorney at TKC Holdings

1260 Andes Boulevard

St. Louis, MO 63132

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Company Merger

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Brewster Chosid on behalf of Keefe Group LLC (Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keefe Group LLC. (Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff Ayoubi and Defendant Hanesbrands, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff Ayoubi and Defendant Hanesbrands, Inc. on 5/5/22. Consent due by 5/26/2022 (amv) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit Lee County Complaint

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case: The Motion to transfer is granted. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 5/16/2022. (dsw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: DETAILS: Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF NextGen 1.6.3 as case 3:22-cv-50158, filed 05/18/2022. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#8) Docket Annotation - case was electronically transferred to Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. (amv) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case: The Motion to transfer is granted. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 5/16/2022. (dsw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case by Keefe Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lee County Complaint)(Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff Ayoubi and Defendant Hanesbrands, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff Ayoubi and Defendant Hanesbrands, Inc. on 5/5/22. Consent due by 5/26/2022 (amv) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-954-DWD. (amv) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keefe Group LLC. (Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Brewster Chosid on behalf of Keefe Group LLC (Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Lee County, case number 19L17 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4779051), filed by Keefe Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Company Merger, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chosid, Alexander) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keefe Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HANESBRANDS INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Brewster Chosid