This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2019 at 08:04:38 (UTC).

Ayodele v. Hudgins et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Ayodele filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hudgins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Michael John Aloi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Quadiri Ayodele

Glenville, WV 26351

Defendants and Respondents

AUSA Flowers

AW Messer

Warden Hudgins

SIS VanDevender

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/8/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

13 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#13

(#13) ORDER CONSTRUING MOTION FOR ABEYANCE AS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, GRANTING THE SAME, AND RE-SETTING TIME granting #11 Motion. Plaintiff has up to and including December 6, 2019 in which to respond to the deficiency notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/6/2019. (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#12

(#12) LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Quadori Ayodele regarding #11 MOTION filed by Quadiri Ayodele. (jmm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) MOTION To Hold Case in Abeyance by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff will show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order why his case should not be dismissed for the failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/24/2019 (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/26/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019 per USPS ebsite. (jmm) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

6 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

6 #1

Bivens Packet

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #5 Order. (copy with Bivens packet via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Bivens Packet) (jmm). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/23/2019 corrected form) (jmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE. The Clerk is directed to correct the nature of the suit and cause of action to reflect that the complaint is a Bivens action, and send the petitioner a Notice of Deficient Pleading and the Court-approved form packet for filing a Bivens civil rights action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/23/2019 (copy via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Quadiri Ayodele. (copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/8/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER CONSTRUING MOTION FOR ABEYANCE AS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, GRANTING THE SAME, AND RE-SETTING TIME granting #11 Motion. Plaintiff has up to and including December 6, 2019 in which to respond to the deficiency notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/6/2019. (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Quadori Ayodele regarding #11 MOTION filed by Quadiri Ayodele. (jmm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION To Hold Case in Abeyance by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff will show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order why his case should not be dismissed for the failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/24/2019 (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/26/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019 per USPS ebsite. (jmm) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #5 Order. (copy with Bivens packet via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Bivens Packet) (jmm). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/23/2019 corrected form) (jmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE. The Clerk is directed to correct the nature of the suit and cause of action to reflect that the complaint is a Bivens action, and send the petitioner a Notice of Deficient Pleading and the Court-approved form packet for filing a Bivens civil rights action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/23/2019 (copy via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Quadiri Ayodele. (copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Letter to the Trust Fund, #3 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Flowers, Hudgins, Messer, VanDevender, filed by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Attachment FCI Gilmer Special Housing Unit Shopping List, #2 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less