This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 08:02:15 (UTC).

Ayers v. State Farm Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Ayers filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Romero, Jill N. Parrish and Paul M. Warner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00991

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul M. Warner

Presiding Judges

Cecilia M. Romero

Jill N. Parrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Ayers

Defendant

State Farm Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gabriel K. White

Attorney at WHITE AND GARNER

370 E South Temple #200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Daniel S. Garner

Attorney at WHITE AND GARNER

370 E South Temple #200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Marshall J. Hendrickson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#15

#13

#12

#11

#8

#7

6 #3

State Notice of Filing for Removal

6 #2

State Affidavit of Service

6 #1

State Complaint

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #11 filed by Plaintiff Karen Ayers (White, Gabriel) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/14/2020. (ss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/12/20. (ss) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. (nl) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant State Farm Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Insurance Company.(Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) File Received from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and Other State Filings (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Affidavit of Service, #3 State Notice of Filing for Removal) (tlh) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/23/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karen Ayers, Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. Form due by 1/7/2020. (nl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Karen Ayers, Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. (nl) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190908624, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3446828) filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendant State Farm Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Christensen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Hendrickson