This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 08:05:36 (UTC).

Aycock v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Aycock filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennafer Aycock

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Equifax Information Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mona Amini

Gustavo E. Ponce

Defendant Attorneys

David Ernesto Chavez

Jennifer L Braster

Benjamin Bradwell Gordon

Cheryl A. O'Brien

Gia Marina

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Motion to Extend Time: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 5/4/2023. (Chavez, David) (answer) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Change of Attorney's Address by Jennafer Aycock.. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC TO ANSWER THE INITIAL COMPLAINT by Jennafer Aycock.. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added.. (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/14/2023.(Gordon, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer - Equifax Information Services, Inc. answer due 5/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Motion to Extend Time : JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 4/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) and Order re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 4/4/2023. (Chavez, David) (answer) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC. (LOE) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC (Amended Summons) by Plaintiff Jennafer Aycock. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #5

Summons as to Equifax Information Services, Inc.

1 #4

Summons as to Trans Union, LLC

1 #3

Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

1 #2

Summons as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Motion to Extend Time: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 5/4/2023. (Chavez, David) (answer) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Attorney's Address by Jennafer Aycock.. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/3/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. On March 31, 2023, Plaintiff filed an Unopposed Request to Extend Time for Defendant TransUnion, LLC to Answer the Initial Complaint. ECF No. #13 . In the Motion the parties request that TransUnion be permitted fourteen additional days to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, citing ongoing settlement discussions. Id. at 2. Despite the failure to comply with Local Rule IA 6-2, which the parties must comply with in the future, the Court grants the request. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant TransUnion, LLC shall have until April 30, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC TO ANSWER THE INITIAL COMPLAINT by Jennafer Aycock.. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added.. (Gordon, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/14/2023.(Gordon, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer - Equifax Information Services, Inc. answer due 5/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Motion to Extend Time : JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 4/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) and Order re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 4/4/2023. (Chavez, David) (answer) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC. (LOE) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (LOE) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC (Amended Summons) by Plaintiff Jennafer Aycock. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ERRATA to #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Jennafer Aycock.. (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jennafer Aycock. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7216604) by Jennafer Aycock. Proof of service due by 5/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #3 Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #4 Summons as to Trans Union, LLC, #5 Summons as to Equifax Information Services, Inc.) (Ponce, Gustavo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less