This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:16:01 (UTC).

Ayala v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Ayala filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01625

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose J. Ayala, Jr.

Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc. a California corporation, and wholly owned subsidiary of Nissan Motor Company of Japan doing business as Nissan USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Elizabeth Bolinger

Attorney at Eclat Law, PLLC

307 Cranes Roost Blvd., Suite 2010

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Jolynn Marie Falto

Attorney at Eclat Law, PLLC

307 Cranes Roost Blvd., Suite 2010

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Mitchell E. Grodman

Attorney at Eclat Law, PLLC

307 Cranes Roost Blvd.

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Kevin Kenneth Ross

Attorney at Eclat Law, PLLC

307 Cranes Roost Blvd.

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M. Michalik

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Elizabeth P. Redpath

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Peter N. Farley

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1230 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

Igor Babichenko

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Thomas R. Brice, Jr.

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

Suite 3300, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #16 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY PETER N. FARLEY, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02 ; granting #17 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ELIZABETH REDPATH, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #18 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY IGOR BABICHENKO, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #19 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER M. MICHALIK, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02.counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/23/2020. (HMK) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

19 #1

Exhibit Michalik

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Christopher M. Michalik to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459490 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michalik)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

18 #1

Exhibit Certification

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Igor Babichenko to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459463 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

17 #1

Exhibit Certification

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Elizabeth Redpath to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459437 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

16 #1

Exhibit Certification

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Peter M. Farley to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459399 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#7

(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jose J. Ayala, Jr. Related case(s): no (Ross, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (LDJ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell E. Grodman on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Grodman, Mitchell) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Elizabeth Bolinger on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Bolinger, Lisa) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jolynn Marie Falto on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Falto, Jolynn) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Nissan North America

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Composite Exemplar Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17267305) filed by Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exemplar Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Nissan North America)(Ross, Kevin) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #16 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY PETER N. FARLEY, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02 ; granting #17 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ELIZABETH REDPATH, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #18 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY IGOR BABICHENKO, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #19 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER M. MICHALIK, AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02.counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/23/2020. (HMK) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Christopher M. Michalik to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459490 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michalik)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Igor Babichenko to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459463 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Elizabeth Redpath to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459437 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Peter M. Farley to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17459399 for $150 by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Brice, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/21/2020. (EJV) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE to counsel Peter N. Farley, Christopher M. Michalik, and Igor Babichenko of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brice, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc. for Nissan North America, Inc... (Brice, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/21/20. (EBU) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jose J. Ayala, Jr. Related case(s): no (Ross, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Jose J. Ayala, Jr identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Company of Japan, Other Affiliate Nissan Motor Company, LTD., Other Affiliate Nissan North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Daimler AG, Other Affiliate Renault, SA for Jose J. Ayala Jr... (Ross, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/4/2020. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RELATED CASE ORDER. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/4/2020. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (LDJ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell E. Grodman on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Grodman, Mitchell) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Elizabeth Bolinger on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Bolinger, Lisa) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jolynn Marie Falto on behalf of Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Falto, Jolynn) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1625-Orl-40GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17267305) filed by Jose J. Ayala, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exemplar Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Nissan North America)(Ross, Kevin) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less