This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:28:23 (UTC).

Ayala v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Ayala filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Murphy Oil USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando Rodriguez, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liz Priscilla Ayala

Defendants

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Murphy USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J Cisneros

Attorney at The Cisneros Law Firm

312 Lindberg Ave

Mcallen, TX 78501

Arturo Cisneros

Attorney at The Cisneros Law Firm

312 Lindberg

Mcallen, TX 78501

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick Wolter

Attorney at Donnell Kieschnick Wolter & Gamez

555 N Carancahua, Suite 400

Corpus Christi, TX 78414

Kristina Fernandez

Attorney at Donnell, Kieschnick, Wolter & Gamez, P.C.

555 N. Carancahua, Ste 400

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Copies of Index Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Affidavit

1 #4

Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiff

1 #5

Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court

1 #6

Exhibit List of Counsel of Record

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., filed.(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Liz Priscilla Ayala, filed.(Cisneros, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Liz Priscilla Ayala, filed.(Cisneros, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., filed.(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 404th Cameron County, case number 2022-DCL-00406 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27797775) filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit Copies of Index Documents, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #6 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record)(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Murphy, as he is the Chapter 7 Trustee of Pagliaro is a litigant