This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2021 at 08:30:43 (UTC).

Ayala-Gonzalez v. Doctors Center Hospital, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Ayala-Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Doctors Center Hospital, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01446

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez

Defendants

Doctors Center Hospital, Inc.

Continental Insurance Company

Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc.

Dr. Felix Maldonado-Trinidad

Dr. Javier Navarro-Morales

Dr. Luis Sotomayor-Guadarrama

Dr. Eddy A. Mieses-Ariza

Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company

Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED)

ABC Insurance Companies

John Does

James Roes

Doctors Center Hospital, Inc. doing business as DCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vanesa Vicens

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Jeffrey M. Williams-English

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Carmen Y. Santiago-Nazario

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque St., 3Rd Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Defendant Attorneys

Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas

Attorney at RC Law and Litigation Services PSC

Doral Bank Building, Suite 801, Resolucion #33

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

Igor Dominguez-Perez

Attorney at Igor J. Dominguez Law Office

Vig Tower Suite 1105, 1225 Ponce De Leon Ave.

San Juan, PR 00907-3921

Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso

Attorney at Benito I. Rodriguez Masso Law Office

407 Calle Bonafoux

San Juan, PR 00918-3023

Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle

Attorney at Morales Morales Law Offices

San Juan, Pr 00924

San Juan, PR 00924

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Defendants Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc..(Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 12, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Javier Navarro-Morales Responses due by 10/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Javier Navarro-Morales Responses due by 10/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summons. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/14/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Doctors Center Hospital, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021; Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021; Javier Navarro-Morales served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc., Felix Maldonado-Trinidad, Eddy A. Mieses-Ariza, Javier Navarro-Morales, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED), Luis Sotomayor-Guadarrama (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#2

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Defendants Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc..(Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Defendant Javier Navarro-Morales.(Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Y. Santiago-Nazario on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Santiago-Nazario, Carmen) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion for extension of time. Co-defendants Luis Sotomayor-Guadarrama and his insurer shall plead or otherwise defend by December 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/8/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for extension of time until 12/04/2021 to ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED), Luis Sotomayor-Guadarrama Responses due by 11/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall plead or otherwise defend by November 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/3/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Felix Maldonado-Trinidad, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED) Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER noted and granted #18 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/25/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Felix Maldonado-Trinidad served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED) Responses due by 11/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summons. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/14/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 12, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Javier Navarro-Morales Responses due by 10/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Javier Navarro-Morales Responses due by 10/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Continental Insurance Company filed by Jeffrey M. Williams-English on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Doctors Center Hospital, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021; Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021; Javier Navarro-Morales served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Doctors Center Hospital, Inc., Doctors' Emergency Services, Inc., Felix Maldonado-Trinidad, Eddy A. Mieses-Ariza, Javier Navarro-Morales, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta del Seguro de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria (SIMED), Luis Sotomayor-Guadarrama (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7455640.), filed by Michelle Y. Ayala-Gonzalez. Service due by 12/15/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant

Latest cases where Doctors Center Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant