This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2023 at 09:44:16 (UTC).

A&Y NUTRITION, LLC v. BIOVATION LABS, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 A Y NUTRITION, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIOVATION LABS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Evelyn Padin and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01528

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Evelyn Padin

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&Y NUTRITION, LLC

Defendant

BIOVATION LABS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK OBERSTAEDT

Defendant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A&Y Nutrition, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14180554), filed by A&Y Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of Disclosure by A&Y Nutrition, LLC. (OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by A&Y NUTRITION, LLC as to BIOVATION LABS, LLC. (OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOVATION LABS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN CHARLES MILLER on behalf of BIOVATION LABS, LLC (MILLER, EVAN) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint to May 15, 2023 by BIOVATION LABS, LLC. (MILLER, EVAN) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT until May 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/19/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#8

(#8) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney EVAN CHARLES MILLER terminated. Attorney JAMES S. RICHTER for BIOVATION LABS, LLC added.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#9

(#9) Letter from Defendant re joint dispute letter regarding extension of time for Defendant to respond to Complaint re #7 Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; The deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to June 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/12/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; The deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to June 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/12/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Letter from Defendant re joint dispute letter regarding extension of time for Defendant to respond to Complaint re #7 Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney EVAN CHARLES MILLER terminated. Attorney JAMES S. RICHTER for BIOVATION LABS, LLC added.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT until May 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/19/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint to May 15, 2023 by BIOVATION LABS, LLC. (MILLER, EVAN) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN CHARLES MILLER on behalf of BIOVATION LABS, LLC (MILLER, EVAN) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOVATION LABS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (sm) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by A&Y NUTRITION, LLC as to BIOVATION LABS, LLC. (OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketJudge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) STATEMENT of Disclosure by A&Y Nutrition, LLC. (OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against A&Y Nutrition, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14180554), filed by A&Y Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(OBERSTAEDT, MARK) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less