This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2020 at 09:04:24 (UTC).

Axon Enterprise Incorporated v. Federal Trade Commission et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Axon Enterprise Incorporated filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Federal Trade Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine and Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Deborah M Fine

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Axon Enterprise Incorporated

Defendants

Rebecca Slaughter

Joseph Simons

Noah Phillips

Federal Trade Commission

Christine Wilson

Rohit Chopra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pamela Beth Petersen

Attorney at Axon Enterprise Incorporated

17800 N 85Th St.

Scottsdale, AZ 85255-9603

Jonathan Adler Direnfeld

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington, DC

1152 15Th St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas King-Sun Fu

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Los Angeles, CA

777 S Figueroa St., Ste. 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Garret Garretson Rasmussen

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington, DC

1152 15Th St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Antony P Kim

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington, DC

1152 15Th St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Bradley Thomas Craigmyle

Attorney at US Dept of Justice Civil Division Federal Programs Branch

1100 L St. Nw, Rm. 11216

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#22

21 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

15 #3

Exhibit 2

15 #2

Exhibit 1

15 #1

Index of Exhibits

#15

#3

2 #5

Summons

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Consideration of Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Rohit Chopra, Federal Trade Commission, Noah Phillips, Joseph Simons, Rebecca Slaughter, Christine Wilson. (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Consideration of Preliminary Injunction Motion by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Pamela) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petersen, Pamela) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE re: Notice of Change of Contact Information by Axon Enterprise Incorporated . (Petersen, Pamela) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Rohit Chopra, Federal Trade Commission, Noah Phillips, Joseph Simons, Rebecca Slaughter, Christine Wilson. (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley Craigmyle appearing for Rohit Chopra, Federal Trade Commission, Noah Phillips, Joseph Simons, Rebecca Slaughter, Christine Wilson. . (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons; Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Preliminary Order dated January 7, 2020; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Mandatory Initial Discovery Users' Manual for the District of Arizona; Civil Cover Sheet; Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement; and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supplemental Declaration of Service to ECF 16) upon Federal Trade Commission; Joseph Simons; Rebecca Slaughter; Christine Wilson; Noah Phillips; Rohit Chopra; Michael Bailey; William P. Barr on January 13, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Direnfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Antony P Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Axon Enterprise Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons; Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Preliminary Order dated January 7, 2020; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Mandatory Initial Discovery Users' Manual for the District of Arizona; Civil Cover Sheet; Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement; and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities upon Federal Trade Commission; Joseph Simons; Rebecca Slaughter; Christine Wilson; Noah Phillips; Rohit Chopra on 1/9/2020 (summons and complaint) and mailed motion for preliminary injunction and supporting memorandum on 1/10/2020; copies of summons and complaint were mailed by certified mail to Michael Bailey on 1/10/2020 and to William P. Barr on January 9, 2020 and mailed motion for preliminary injunction and supporting memorandum January 10, 2020, Postal Service delivery confirmation or signed PS Form 3811 not provided for Bailey or Barr, per Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Direnfeld, Jonathan) * Modified to add text; attorney noticed on 1/13/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Garret Garretson Rasmussen on behalf of Plaintiff Axon Enterprise Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Petersen, Pamela) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Petersen, Pamela) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Rohit Chopra, Federal Trade Commission, Noah Phillips, Joseph Simons, Rebecca Slaughter, Christine Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17790993. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00014-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *Summons Submitted by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Petersen, Pamela) *Modified to correct event type and text on 1/3/2020 (BAC). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17790993 filed by Axon Enterprise Incorporated. (Petersen, Pamela) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TASER INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan A. Direnfeld

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela B Petersen