This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2023 at 09:19:14 (UTC).

Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 Axis Surplus Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and Bradley W. Rath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

Bradley W. Rath

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Axis Surplus Insurance Company

Defendant

Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A. Montgomery

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 5058316) filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Repath, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Deposition of Jim Grotkowski, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Repath

1 #2

Exhibit B - Transcript of Deposition of Jim Grotkowski

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Letter from W. Dilmore, Attorney Admissions Clerk, to Michael A. Montgomery regarding admission to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. (PKS) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#3

(#3) Order Directing Plaintiff's Attorney to Become Admitted to this Court or Plaintiff Must Obtain New Counsel, and Requiring Plaintiff to Establish Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on April 3, 2023.(eb) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC, filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B- EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development)(Montgomery, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

4 #2

Exhibit B- EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development

#5

(#5) ORDER requiring Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company to Establish Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on April 14, 2023. (eb) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC, filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development (Jim Grotkowski) taken 3/9/22)(Montgomery, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

6 #2

Exhibit B - EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development (Jim Grotkowski

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC. (JCH) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC. (JCH) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC, filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development (Jim Grotkowski) taken 3/9/22)(Montgomery, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER requiring Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company to Establish Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on April 14, 2023. (eb) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC, filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B- EUO Transcript of Diamondhead Commercial Development)(Montgomery, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Plaintiff's Attorney to Become Admitted to this Court or Plaintiff Must Obtain New Counsel, and Requiring Plaintiff to Establish Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on April 3, 2023.(eb) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from W. Dilmore, Attorney Admissions Clerk, to Michael A. Montgomery regarding admission to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. (PKS) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Diamondhead Commercial Development, LLC (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 5058316) filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Repath, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Deposition of Jim Grotkowski, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less