This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2023 at 13:11:15 (UTC).

A.W.S. et al v. Southampton Union Free School District

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 A W S filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Southampton Union Free School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Denis R. Hurley and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denis R. Hurley

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A.W.S.

Jonathan K. Smith

Kayla Looking Horse

Defendant

Southampton Union Free School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott M. Moore

Defendant Attorneys

Christine Gasser

Jennifer S. Heitman

David H. Arntsen

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

13 #1

Certificate of Service

8 #2

Exhibit Return of Service

8 #1

Declaration Declaration of Scott M. Moore in Support of Application

#8

(#8) Request for Certificate of Default by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott M. Moore in Support of Application, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default) (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#17

#15

#14

#12

#11

#7

#6

#4

#3

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER re #17 : The telephone conference on April 8, 2019 is hereby cancelled. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/4/2019. (Bochner, Francesca) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Letter withdrawing request for pre-motion conference (Doc. 15) by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER finding as moot #11 : Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/3/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: re #15 A telephone conference will be held in this matter on Monday, April 8, 2019 at 11:00 AM to discuss Plaintiffs' request for a pre-motion conference for a proposed motion to strike. Plaintiffs' counsel will initiate the call and counsel for both sides shall be on the line before calling Chambers at (631) 712-5650. In the event counsel is unavailable at the scheduled time, s/he shall consult with opposing counsel and provide two alternate dates and/or times by letter filed on ECF on or before April 5, 2019. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/3/2019. (Bochner, Francesca) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Letter request for pre-motion conference to strike the Answer filed by Defendant and for entry of default by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) REPLY in Support re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Southampton Union Free School District. (Gasser, Christine) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Southampton Union Free School District. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gasser, Christine) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, and Cross Motion to Direct Clerk's Entry of Default filed by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith. (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Southampton Union Free School District. (Gasser, Christine) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Request for Certificate of Default by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott M. Moore in Support of Application, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default) (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER re #7 : The time for Southampton Union Free School District is extended to and including March 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/19/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or motion in response to Summons and Complaint by Southampton Union Free School District. (Arntsen, David) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.W.S., Jonathan K. Smith, Kayla Looking Horse. Southampton Union Free School District served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Southampton Union Free School District. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by A.W.S., Kayla Looking Horse, Jonathan K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Southampton Union Free School District filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11199965 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by A.W.S., Jonathan K. Smith, Kayla Looking Horse. (Moore, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less