This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:10:35 (UTC).

AWAL Digital Ltd. v. eMusic.com Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 AWAL Digital Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against eMusic com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03346

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AWAL Digital Ltd.

AWAL UK Ltd.

Defendant

eMusic.com Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Caplan

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Julie B. Wlodinguer

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) shall arrange for the conference call. Each scheduled conference will take place on the date and time originally set. The conference in this case is scheduled for July 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff(s) counsel shall: (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov ; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/24/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. eMusic.com Inc. served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist, New York Secretary of State. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on July 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/30/2020) (ama) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to eMusic.com Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to eMusic.com Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Wlodinguer on behalf of AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kobalt London Limited for AWAL Digital Ltd.. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D - January 23, 2020 Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - January 7, 2020 Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B - October 30, 2019 Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - July 31, 2018 Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against eMusic.com Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19633478)Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 31, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - October 30, 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - January 7, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - January 23, 2020 Letter).(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) shall arrange for the conference call. Each scheduled conference will take place on the date and time originally set. The conference in this case is scheduled for July 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff(s) counsel shall: (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov ; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/24/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. eMusic.com Inc. served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist, New York Secretary of State. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on July 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/30/2020) (ama) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to eMusic.com Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to eMusic.com Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Wlodinguer on behalf of AWAL Digital Ltd...(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kobalt London Limited for AWAL Digital Ltd.. Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd...(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against eMusic.com Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19633478)Document filed by AWAL Digital Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 31, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - October 30, 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - January 7, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - January 23, 2020 Letter).(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where eMusic.com Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie B. Wlodinguer