This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 08:06:14 (UTC).

A.W. v. San Diego Unified School District

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 A W filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against San Diego Unified School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02053

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.W.

Defendant

San Diego Unified School District

Guardian Ad Litems

Greg Wells

Felicia Wells

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Jennifer L. Varga

3505 Camino Del Rio South, Suite 340

San Diego, CA 92108

Meagan Nunez

9606 Tierra Grande St., Suite 204

San Diego, CA 92115

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie Garnica

Jonathan Patrick Read

Attorney at Fagen Friedman Fulfrost, LLP

1525 Faraday Avenue, Suite 300

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Shiva E Stein

Attorney at Fagen Friedman & Fulfrost

1525 Faraday, Suite 300

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice #7 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/30/20. (jmo) (dlg). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by A.W., Felicia Wells, Greg Wells. (Varga, Jennifer) (mme). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shiva E Stein on behalf of San Diego Unified School District (Stein, Shiva)Attorney Shiva E Stein added to party San Diego Unified School District(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Granting Petition for Guardian Ad Litem. Felicia Wells and Greg Wells appointed as guardians ad litem for plaintiff A.W. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/27/2020. (jrm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.W.. All Defendants served. (Varga, Jennifer)(jrm). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem by A.W.. (mcb)(sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit Index

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against San Diego Unified School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14704826.), filed by A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2053-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Varga, Jennifer)(mcb)(sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice #7 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/30/20. (jmo) (dlg). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by A.W., Felicia Wells, Greg Wells. (Varga, Jennifer) (mme). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shiva E Stein on behalf of San Diego Unified School District (Stein, Shiva)Attorney Shiva E Stein added to party San Diego Unified School District(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Granting Petition for Guardian Ad Litem. Felicia Wells and Greg Wells appointed as guardians ad litem for plaintiff A.W. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/27/2020. (jrm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.W.. All Defendants served. (Varga, Jennifer)(jrm). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem by A.W.. (mcb)(sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against San Diego Unified School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14704826.), filed by A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2053-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Varga, Jennifer)(mcb)(sjt). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less