This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:43:18 (UTC).

A.W. v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2021 A W filed an Other lawsuit against Red Roof Inns, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah D. Morrison, Algenon L. Marbley and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04934

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Algenon L. Marbley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.W.

Defendants

Red Roof Inns, Inc.

Best Western International, Inc.

G6 Hospitality, LLC

Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association

American Hotel and Lodging Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emanuella J. Paulos

Attorney at Levin Law Firm

316 South Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Kathryn L. Avila

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A

316 S. Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Steven Charles Babin, Jr.

Attorney at Babin Law, LLC

22 East Gay Street, Ste 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

D Patrick Kasson

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA

200 South Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

Thomas N. Spyker

Attorney at REMINGER CO., LPA

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by D Patrick Kasson for Defendant American Hotel and Lodging Association (Kasson, D) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Documents: #6 , #8 , #9 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Zarzaur, Kimberly Adams & Christopher Tisi filed by A. R. Deficiency Deadline by 11/29/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

7 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

7 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

7 #7

Main Document

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #6

Main Document

5 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-849 and 2:19-cv-5384 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2021. (kk2) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

2 #2

Summons Form G6 Hospitality LLC

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by D Patrick Kasson for Defendant American Hotel and Lodging Association (Kasson, D) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Documents: #6 , #8 , #9 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Zarzaur, Kimberly Adams & Christopher Tisi filed by A. R. Deficiency Deadline by 11/29/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTATION ORDER granting #5 & #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emanuella Paulos and Kathryn Avila. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/12/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8578553) of Christopher V. Tisi by Plaintiff A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8578553) of Kimberly Adams by Plaintiff A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8578553) of Kathryn L. Avila by Plaintiff A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8578553) of Gregory Zarzaur by Plaintiff A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8578553) of Emmie J. Paulos by Plaintiff A.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-849 and 2:19-cv-5384 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2021. (kk2) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to American Hotel and Lodging Association, Best Western International Inc., G6 Hospitality LLC, Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association, and Red Roof Inns Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Best Western International Inc., #2 Summons Form G6 Hospitality LLC, #3 Summons Form American Hotel & Lodging Association, #4 Summons Form Ohio Hotel & Lodging Association) (kk2) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8524914), filed by A. W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association is a litigant

Latest cases where American Hotel and Lodging Association is a litigant

Latest cases where RED ROOF INNS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant