Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2020 at 11:10:50 (UTC).

Avramham et al v. The Gvent State of N.Y. et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Avramham filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Gvent State of N Y. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louis L. Stanton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04441

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moshe Avramham

New Hampton, NY 10924

Mr. Flores

2834 Route 17M

New Hampton, NY 10924

Defendants

Kristin Orlando

Cavole

Densen

(O[BW]MH)

Jo Ann O.

Lisa C. Hendrickson

E. Campbell

Mid-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Center

Christina Thorn

M. Jordan

S. Bayiz

Montgomery

Theveis Neil

Joseph Meverd

Irene B. Donato

Jeffery Andrew

B. Magsoyghloy

Martha Crowner

5 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) LETTER from Moshe Avramham re: I am being denied receipt of my incoming mail since 6/22/2020. Document filed by Moshe Avramham.(sbr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

4 #1

Appeal Package

#4

(#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The dismissal is without prejudice to any claims Flores may assert on his own behalf or through a duly appointed representative, or a guardian ad litem or next friend who is an attorney or represented by an attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff Avramham and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/14/2020) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Avramham and note service on the docket. The Court grants Avramham IFP status for the limited purpose of this order. The Court dismisses the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The dismissal is without prejudice to any claims Flores may assert on his own behalf or through a duly appointed representative, or a guardian ad litem or next friend who is an attorney or represented by an attorney. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/14/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 7/16/2020 (nb). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#2

(#2) LETTER from M. Avramham dated 5/12/20 re: I am the next friend of the above noted individual(Mr. Flores) who prepared and mailed the incomplete 42:1983 OSC TRO/Injunction under emergency circumstances of and including, but not limited to, obstruction by MHFPC staff etc. Document filed by Moshe Avramham.(sc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against (O[BW]MH), Jeffery Andrew, S. Bayiz, E. Campbell, Cavole, Martha Crowner, Densen, Irene B. Donato, Lisa C. Hendrickson, M. Jordan, B. Magsoyghloy, Joseph Meverd, Mid-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Center, Montgomery, Eric Muhru, NYS Office, Theveis Neil, Jo Ann O., Kristin Orlando, Sorin Saladie, The Gvent State of N.Y., Christina Thorn. Document filed by Moshe Avramham, Flores. (sac) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Moshe Avramham re: I am being denied receipt of my incoming mail since 6/22/2020. Document filed by Moshe Avramham.(sbr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Judgment, #3 Order of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Package), to Moshe Avramham at ID No. 8451374-8700, Mid-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Center, 2834 Route 17M, POB 158, New Hampton, NY 10924. (dsh) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The dismissal is without prejudice to any claims Flores may assert on his own behalf or through a duly appointed representative, or a guardian ad litem or next friend who is an attorney or represented by an attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff Avramham and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/14/2020) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Avramham and note service on the docket. The Court grants Avramham IFP status for the limited purpose of this order. The Court dismisses the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The dismissal is without prejudice to any claims Flores may assert on his own behalf or through a duly appointed representative, or a guardian ad litem or next friend who is an attorney or represented by an attorney. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/14/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 7/16/2020 (nb). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from M. Avramham dated 5/12/20 re: I am the next friend of the above noted individual(Mr. Flores) who prepared and mailed the incomplete 42:1983 OSC TRO/Injunction under emergency circumstances of and including, but not limited to, obstruction by MHFPC staff etc. Document filed by Moshe Avramham.(sc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against (O[BW]MH), Jeffery Andrew, S. Bayiz, E. Campbell, Cavole, Martha Crowner, Densen, Irene B. Donato, Lisa C. Hendrickson, M. Jordan, B. Magsoyghloy, Joseph Meverd, Mid-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Center, Montgomery, Eric Muhru, NYS Office, Theveis Neil, Jo Ann O., Kristin Orlando, Sorin Saladie, The Gvent State of N.Y., Christina Thorn. Document filed by Moshe Avramham, Flores. (sac) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTGOMERY(D) is a litigant