This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 09:55:25 (UTC).

Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al v. Lupin Limited et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lupin Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00729

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Albion Laboratories, Inc.

Defendants

Lupin Limited

Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael A. Chajon

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th St. Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20008

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: April 19, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: June 1, 2027. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/19/2024. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,838,042 B2. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parents Acella Holdings, LLC, Alora Pharmaceuticals, LLC for Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Balchem Corporation for Albion Laboratories, Inc. filed by Albion Laboratories, Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 6/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Lupin Limited on 6/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Autumn N. Nero, Olivia Radics, and Andrew T. Dufrense, Ph.D. - filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Autumn N. Nero, Olivia Radics, and Andrew T. Dufrense, Ph.D., filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/10/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Autumn N. Nero, Olivia Radics, and Andrew T. Dufrense, Ph.D. - filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Lupin Limited on 6/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 6/3/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Balchem Corporation for Albion Laboratories, Inc. filed by Albion Laboratories, Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parents Acella Holdings, LLC, Alora Pharmaceuticals, LLC for Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,838,042 B2. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: April 19, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: June 1, 2027. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/19/2024. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3887827.) - filed by Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Albion Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avion Pharmaceuticals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis