This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 07:10:13 (UTC).

Melvin Avila v. Kiewit Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Melvin Avila filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kiewit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05740

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melvin Avila

Defendants

AES Corporation

AES Southland Energy, LLC

Kiewit Corporation

AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seung Lyun Yang

Attorney at Moon and Yang APC

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 1880

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shani Kupferman Huang

Attorney at Moon and Yang APC

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 1880

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

Michael David Hidalgo

Attorney at Baker and McKenzie LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Declaration of Shani Huang

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. COURT ORDER TAKING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT #11 OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for September 9, 2019, is vacated and taken off calendar. An order will issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Melvin Avila. (Huang, Shani) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS AES CORPORATION, AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY, LLC, AND AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II, LLC #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy, LLC, and AESSouthland Energy Holdings II, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each side is to bear their/his own costs and attorneys' fees. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss AES Defendants AES Southland Energy, LLC, AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC filed by AES Defendants AES Southland Energy, LLC, AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant Kiewit Corporation. (Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT UNTIL 14 DAYS AFTER COURT RULES ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND #12 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants Kiewit Corporation, AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy, LLC, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC's time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint in this action is extended to fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on Plaintiff's pending Motion to Remand. (iv) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 14 days after Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Kiewit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Melvin Avila. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shani Huang, #2 Proposed Order) (Huang, Shani) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants Kiewit Corporation, AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy, LLC, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC's time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action is extended to August 7, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AES Southland Energy, LLC answer now due 8/7/2019; AES Corporation answer now due 8/7/2019; Kiewit Corporation answer now due 8/7/2019; AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC answer now due 8/7/2019, filed by Joint AES Southland Energy, LLC; AES Corporation; Kiewit Corporation; AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05740 MWF(JPRx). (rn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Does 1 through 25, Kiewit Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Melvin Avila. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/24/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Kiewit Corporation, (Re: Notice of Removal) served on July 1, 2019. (Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Kiewit Corporation, identifying Melvin Avila, Kiewit Power Constructors Co., Kiewit Energy Group, Inc., Kiewit Corporation, and Peter Kiewit Sons', Inc.. (Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Kiewit Corporation (Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC, AES Southland Energy, LLC, Kiewit Corporation. (Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV18140 Receipt No: 0973-24016362 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants AES Southland Energy, LLC, AES Corporation, Kiewit Corporation, AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - First Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Paystubs) (Attorney Michael David Hidalgo added to party AES Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael David Hidalgo added to party AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael David Hidalgo added to party AES Southland Energy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael David Hidalgo added to party Kiewit Corporation(pty:dft))(Hidalgo, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant