This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2021 at 09:47:06 (UTC).

Aviator Financial Consulting, LLC et al v. KSJ Family, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Aviator Financial Consulting, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KSJ Family, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Joseph Paladino, Jr.

Aviator Financial Consulting, LLC

Defendants

Ronald Ciaravella

Lexi-Aire, Inc.

Scott Evashuk

George Stickel

World Wide Option, LLC

KSJ Family, Inc.

Celia Mae Perkins

International Aircraft Marketing & Sales, LLC

James Perkins

Paula McCabe

Michael Lewis

WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC

Robert Brown

N421BM, LLC

James F. Perkins

Scott Evaschuk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary Linn Evans

Attorney at Coats and Evans PC

Po Box 130246

The Woodlands, TX 77393

George Andrew Coats

Attorney at Coats Evans PC

P O Box 130246

The Woodlands, TX 77393-0246

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine A Staton

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2323 Ross Ave, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Meagan Martin Powers

Attorney at Martin Powers & Counsel

600 E. John Carpenter Freeway, Suite 234

Irving, TX 75062

Luke J. Gilman

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Amy Marie Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order

#10

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A-F

#8

#7

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email

#5

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Amy M. Stewart by Paula McCabe, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Katherine A Staton and James Struble are terminated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting Joint Agreed #13 Motion tp Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Deft. Responses due by 4/7/2021..(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/23/2021 at 10:15 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. NOTE: The change is due to an extension in the time to answer. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by International Aircraft Marketing & Sales, LLC, Michael Lewis, Celia Mae Perkins, James F. Perkins, World Wide Option, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin Powers, Meagan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Martin Powers on behalf of Celia Mae Perkins, James F. Perkins, filed. (Martin Powers, Meagan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Meagan Martin Powers in place of Katherine A. Staton, Luke J. Gilman, Colton Tobias, and James Struble by International Aircraft Marketing & Sales, LLC, Michael Lewis, World Wide Option, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin Powers, Meagan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ronald Ciaravella, Scott Evaschuk, KSJ Family, Inc., N421BM, LLC, George Stickel, WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ronald Ciaravella, Scott Evaschuk, KSJ Family, Inc., N421BM, LLC, George Stickel, WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, filed.(Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Removal Supplement by Ronald Ciaravella, Scott Evaschuk, KSJ Family, Inc., N421BM, LLC, George Stickel, WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Second Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for All Defendants 3/17/2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint ; Answer due for All Defendants 2/26/2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by KSJ Family, Inc., Paula McCabe, N421BM, LLC, WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, World Wide Option, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email, #2 Proposed Order)(Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert Brown, Ronald Ciaravella, Scott Evaschuk, International Aircraft Marketing & Sales, LLC, KSJ Family, Inc., Michael Lewis, Lexi-Aire, Inc., Paula McCabe, N421BM, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2021. (Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/26/2021 at 10:15 AM in by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Defendants' Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, by KSJ Family, Inc., Paula McCabe, N421BM, LLC, WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, World Wide Option, LLC, filed. (Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th Judicial District, case number 20-12-15761 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25928358) filed by World Wide Option, LLC, KSJ Family, Inc., WestCoast Aviation Services, LLC, Paula McCabe, N421BM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Executed Returns of Service, #5 Exhibit E - List of Counsel of Record)(Staton, Katherine) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL AIRCRAFT MARKETING & SALES LLC is a litigant