This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:10:14 (UTC).

Aviation South LLC v. Lotus Horizons LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Aviation South LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Lotus Horizons LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60843

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aviation South LLC

Defendants

Lotus Horizons, LLC.

Delta Private Jets LLC

Gama Aviation Engineering Inc.

Lotus Horizons, LLC. a Florida limited liability company doing business as LOTUS AVIATION GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roberto Mario Vargas

Attorney at Jones Foster Johnston & Stubbs

505 S Flagler Drive, Suite 1100 Po Box 3475

West Palm Beach, FL 33402-3475

Stephen L. Tupper

Attorney at Tupper Law Firm PC

41000 Woodward, Suite 350 East

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

David E. Plunkett

Attorney at Williams Williams Rattner & Plunkett PC

380 N Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorney

Juan Carlos Zorrilla

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett

1395 Brickell Avenue, 14Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E JUNE 2015 TAKEOVER

1 #4

Exhibit D 05/22/15 LOG BOOK

1 #3

Exhibit C TECHNICAL ACCEPTANCE LETTER

1 #2

Exhibit B PURCHASE SALE AGREEMENT UNSIGNED

1 #1

Exhibit A PURCHASE SALE AGREEMENT SIGNED

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Carlos Zorrilla on behalf of Gama Aviation Engineering Inc.. Attorney Juan Carlos Zorrilla added to party Gama Aviation Engineering Inc. (pty:dft). (Zorrilla, Juan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Dismissing Defendant Lotus Horizons, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing Regarding Stephen L. Tupper. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/11/2020. (as03) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing Regarding David E. Plunkett. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/11/2020. (as03) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen L. Tupper. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13010565 by Aviation South LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David E. Plunkett. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13010545 by Aviation South LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice against Lotus Horizons, LLC d/b/a Lotus Aviation Group by Aviation South LLC (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Defendants Delta Private Jets LLC and Gama Aviation Engineering Inc. shall not file a response until Defendant Lotus Horizons, LLC has been served with process. After all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mhn) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #7 Order to Show Cause, GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING INC. filed by Aviation South LLC. (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #7 Order to Show Cause, DELTA PRIVATE JETS LLC filed by Aviation South LLC. (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before July 23, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon Defendants or show good cause as to why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/20/2020. (mhn) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Delta Private Jets LLC, Gama Aviation Engineering Inc., Lotus Horizons, LLC. (jas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) DELTA PRIVATE JETS LLC by Aviation South LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by Aviation South LLC (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING INC. by Aviation South LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by Aviation South LLC (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) LOTUS HORIZONS LLC d/b/a LOTUS AVIATION GROUP by Aviation South LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by Aviation South LLC (Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12794153, filed by Aviation South LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A PURCHASE SALE AGREEMENT SIGNED, #2 Exhibit B PURCHASE SALE AGREEMENT UNSIGNED, #3 Exhibit C TECHNICAL ACCEPTANCE LETTER, #4 Exhibit D 05/22/15 LOG BOOK, #5 Exhibit E JUNE 2015 TAKEOVER, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vargas, Roberto) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Delta Private Jets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Carlos Zorrilla