This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:51:48 (UTC).

Avery et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Avery filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00898

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Devon Avery

Blondel Garner

Brian Hayes

Daniel Moon

Timothy Ryan

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher L Springer

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP

801 Garden St Ste 301

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Derek W. Loeser

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

1201 Third Ave., #3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

1201 Third Ave., #3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Juli E. Farris

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Thomas E Loeser

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN SOBOL SHAPIRO LLP (WA)

1301 2Nd Avenue, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Cari Campen Laufenberg

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Emma Marguerite Wright

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

19 #1

*Restricted*

19 #19

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

18 #1

CTO email

18 #18

Main Document

#16

(#16) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Springer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335211 (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#14

(#14) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall have until 11/17/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#11

(#11) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cari Campen Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan. (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc attorney Laufenberg [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118-BAT, 21-cv-01119-BJR, 21-cv-1130-JRC, 21-cv-01137-RSL, 21-cv-01138-RSL, 21-cv-01139-RAJ, 21-cv-01148-RSL, 21-cv-01153, 21-cv-01157-TLF, 21-cv-01161-RSL, 21-cv-01169, 21-cv-01179, by Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan. (Wright, Emma) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01189. (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher L Springer for Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Springer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335211 (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall have until 11/17/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cari Campen Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan. (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc attorney Laufenberg [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketHon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118-BAT, 21-cv-01119-BJR, 21-cv-1130-JRC, 21-cv-01137-RSL, 21-cv-01138-RSL, 21-cv-01139-RAJ, 21-cv-01148-RSL, 21-cv-01153, 21-cv-01157-TLF, 21-cv-01161-RSL, 21-cv-01169, 21-cv-01179, by Plaintiffs Devon Avery, Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Daniel Moon, Timothy Ryan. (Wright, Emma) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7231855) Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright added to party Devon Avery(pty:pla), Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright added to party Blondel Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright added to party Daniel Moon(pty:pla), Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright added to party Timothy Ryan(pty:pla), filed by Blondel Garner, Brian Hayes, Devon Avery, Timothy Ryan, Daniel Moon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wright, Emma) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten malformed PDF on 8/31/2021) (STP). [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve Y Koh