This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2019 at 08:38:25 (UTC).

Avelino v. Wendy's Properties, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Avelino filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wendy's Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucinda Avelino

Defendant

Wendy's Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence P. Almagno, Jr.

Attorney at Almagno Law

10 Rangeley Road

Cranston, RI 02920

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey P. Finan

Attorney at Finan Law Offices

1130 Ten Rod Road, Suite B-208

North Kingstown, RI 02852

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 8/31/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/2/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/2/2020; Expert Discovery to close by 12/2/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 1/4/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/7/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 10/7/2019; Lawrence P. Almagno, Jr. and Jeffrey P. Finan participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED to Monday, 10/7/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Wendy's Properties, LLC. (Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 9/30/2019 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Wendy's Properties, LLC.(Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Wendy's Properties, LLC. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Corrective Docket Entry Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-1261. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1410603, filed by Wendy's Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Wendy's Properties, LLC. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Corrective Docket Entry Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2019-1261. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1410603, filed by Wendy's Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Finan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wendy's Properties, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence P. Almagno, Jr.