This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 08:32:02 (UTC).

Avalos v. Franco De Pizano et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Avalos filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Franco De Pizano. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01571

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Avalos

Defendants

Mohinder Kaur

Martha Franco De Pizano

Lindsay, CA 93247

Baljit Singh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R. Manning, Jr.

Attorney at Manning Law, APC

20062 Sw Birch Street, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Catherine M. Corfee

Attorney at Corfee Stone & Associates

P.O. Box 1098

Carmichael, CA 95609

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS BALJIT SINGH AND MOHINDER KAUR OR A NOTICE OF STATUS OF ACTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a request for entry of default on the non-responding defendants or a notice regarding the status of this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/8/2020. (Apodaca, P) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Mohinder Kaur, Baljit Singh. Attorney Corfee, Catherine M. added.(Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

10 #1

Declaration Re: Entry of Default

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Baljit Singh by George Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default)(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Martha Franco De Pizano served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mohinder Kaur served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Baljit Singh served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 ADA Complaint by Martha Franco De Pizano. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

4 #4

VDRP

4 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Martha Franco De Pizano, Mohinder Kaur, Baljit Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *20062 SW Birch Street* *Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9230457) (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default served on Martha Franco De Pizano. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Baljit Singh. The clerk hereby declines to enter #10 Request for Entry of Default filed by George Avalos due to #11 Answer being filed on 12/14/2020. (TEXT ONLY) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Mohinder Kaur, Baljit Singh. Attorney Corfee, Catherine M. added.(Corfee, Catherine) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Baljit Singh by George Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default)(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, served on Martha Franco De Pizano. (Apodaca, P) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS BALJIT SINGH AND MOHINDER KAUR OR A NOTICE OF STATUS OF ACTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a request for entry of default on the non-responding defendants or a notice regarding the status of this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/8/2020. (Apodaca, P) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Martha Franco De Pizano served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mohinder Kaur served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Baljit Singh served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 ADA Complaint by Martha Franco De Pizano. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Martha Franco De Pizano, Mohinder Kaur, Baljit Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *20062 SW Birch Street* *Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9230457) (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Richard Manning, Jr