Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 21:14:13 (UTC).

Avalonbay Communites, Inc. v. Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Avalonbay Communites, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04389

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avalonbay Communites, Inc.

Defendants

Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, -

Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric L Springe

Attorney at Ryan and Associates APLC

110 West A Street Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Greg J Ryan

Attorney at Greg J Ryan Law Offices

110 West A Street Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

William C Morison

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Michael Dale Prough

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Henry M Su

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Certificate of Service

12 #1

Exhibit

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Certificate of Service

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 9:30 a.m (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company.(Prough, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, identifying RLI Insurance Company. (Prough, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears Attorney William C. Morison's CM/ECF login was used to e-file the Notice of Removal in this case for Attorney Michael Dale Prough, the attorney who actually represents the defendant. Mr. Morison did not sign the Notice of Removal, nor is mentioned anywhere in any document filed in this case. This substitute e-filing practice violates Local Rule 5-4.3.4(e). (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Morison, William) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on July 23, 2021. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Avalonbay Communites, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Greg) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by AvalonBay Communities, Inc. Avalonbay Communites, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Greg) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 9:30 a.m (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company.(Prough, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, identifying RLI Insurance Company. (Prough, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears Attorney William C. Morison's CM/ECF login was used to e-file the Notice of Removal in this case for Attorney Michael Dale Prough, the attorney who actually represents the defendant. Mr. Morison did not sign the Notice of Removal, nor is mentioned anywhere in any document filed in this case. This substitute e-filing practice violates Local Rule 5-4.3.4(e). (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Avalonbay Communites, Inc. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Morison, William) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior, case number 56-2021-00552976-CU-IC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-31361926 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney William C Morison added to party Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Morison, William) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant