This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 09:30:01 (UTC).

Avalon Smoke Shop v. Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Avalon Smoke Shop filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05316

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avalon Smoke Shop

Chicago, IL 60619

Defendants

Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation

Illinois Office of Minority Economic Empowerment

As-Yet Unknown Defendants

Brett Bender

Alma M. Tello

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The plaintiff in this case, which is a limited liability company (LLC), has filed a pro se lawsuit against a number of state governmental agencies and officials. Unfortunately, however, in Illinois a limited liability company, like a corporation, may not represent itself in court; it has to have a lawyer. See, e.g., 1756 W. Lake St. LLC v. Am. Chartered Bank, 787 F.3d 383, 385 (7th Cir. 2015). Unless plaintiff files, by November 27, 2020, an appearance of counsel and an amended complaint signed by counsel, the Court will be required to dismiss the case without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/30/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Avalon Smoke Shop for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Avalon Smoke Shop (lma, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Avalon Smoke Shop (lma, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PS Illinois Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation is a litigant