This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 09:34:12 (UTC).

Avallon v. City of Newport et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Avallon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Newport. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00515

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Avallon

Defendants

Eric Adkins

Ian McGregor

City of Newport

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael W. Garland

Attorney at McKinnon & Harwood, LLC

1168 Newport Avenue

Pawtucket, RI 02861

Defendant Attorney

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street, 272-4442, Fax: 272-9937

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Removal - State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan to be scheduled in late-November 2021. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 7/26/2021; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/27/2021; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 9/27/2021; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/27/2021; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/26/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 11/26/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Rule 16 Conference via Zoom held on 1/26/2021: counsel present: M. Garland; M. DeSisto. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference via Zoom scheduled for Tuesday 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 918 6057, Passcode: 435298) (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/22/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Garland on behalf of Kimberly Avallon (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Eric Adkins, City of Newport, Ian McGregor.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number nc-2019-0291. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1575584, filed by Ian McGregor, Eric Adkins, City of Newport. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Eric Adkins, City of Newport, Ian McGregor.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number nc-2019-0291. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1575584, filed by Ian McGregor, Eric Adkins, City of Newport. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Garland