This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:22:41 (UTC).

Avaid Hotels L L C v. Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Avaid Hotels L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Mark L Hornsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01973

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avaid Hotels L L C doing business as Country Inn & Suites LA

Defendants

Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc

Navigators Specialty Insurance Co

Navigators Management Co Inc

Aspen Specialty Insurance Co

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co

Amalgamated Insurance Underwriters L L C

First Specialty Insurance Co

Hudson Specialty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Elizabeth Checki

Galen M Hair

Defendant Attorneys

Erin F Parkinson

James Paul Nader

Bayle Marie Beermann

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Proposed order

#23

#22

#21

20 #3

Exhibit 3

20 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

#19

#12

1 #10

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #9

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #8

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #6

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #5

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #4

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #3

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #2

Proposed summons/writ Summons

1 #1

Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) MOTION for David E. Heiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4807591) by Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co, First Specialty Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Parkinson, Erin) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #12 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Erin F Parkinson on behalf of Navigators Management Co Inc. Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #19 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Without Prejudice. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Without Prejudice filed by Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, Aspen Specialty Insurance Co, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co, First Specialty Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(aty,Parkinson, Erin) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Without Prejudice by Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, Aspen Specialty Insurance Co, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co, First Specialty Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. (Attorney Erin F Parkinson added to party Aspen Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Parkinson, Erin) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hudson Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Parkinson, Erin) Modified to add Hudson Insurance Co, Odyssey Reinsurance Co, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd and Odyssey Re Holdings Corp as corporate parents on 8/31/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Parkinson, Erin) Modified to add Sequentis Financial L L C as Corporate Parent on 8/31/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Parkinson, Erin) Modified to add Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, Navigators Insurance Co and Navigators Group Inc as corporate parent on 8/31/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Parkinson, Erin) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc. (aty,Parkinson, Erin) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Ltd for Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Nader, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Erin F Parkinson on behalf of Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, First Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/25/2021. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to James Paul Nader on behalf of Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/25/2021. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.9 Certificate, #2 Text of proposed order Proposed Order)(Attorney James Paul Nader added to party Aspen Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Nader, James) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc. and First Specialty Insurance Corporation, incorrectly named as Swiss Re International SE, shall answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 31, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/6/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, First Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Erin F Parkinson added to party Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc(pty:dft), Swiss Re International S E(pty:dft))(aty,Parkinson, Erin) Modified on 8/6/2021 to modify filers and docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint and include citizenship information in accordance with the rules set forth in this memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, Amalgamated Insurance Underwriters L L C, Aspen Specialty Insurance Co, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co, Hudson Insurance Co, Navigators Insurance Co, Navigators Management Co Inc, Navigators Specialty Insurance Co, Swiss Re International S E. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 07/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021

DocketCASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 07/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Co U S Inc, Amalgamated Insurance Underwriters L L C, Aspen Specialty Insurance Co, Ategrity Specialty Insurance Co, Hudson Insurance Co, Navigators Insurance Co, Navigators Management Co Inc, Navigators Specialty Insurance Co, Swiss Re International S E with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732410) filed by Avaid Hotels L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #3 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #4 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #5 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #6 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #7 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #8 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #9 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #10 Proposed summons/writ Summons)(Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Checki added to party Avaid Hotels L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Checki, Lauren) Modified on 7/10/2021 to modify docket text (Whidden, C). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less