This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 16:18:34 (UTC).

Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc. v. Katerra Construction, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Katerra Construction, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Katerra Construction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Justin B. Mazzara

Attorney at Pavese Law Firm

P.O. Box 1507

Fort Myers, FL 33902

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Rosenberg

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.

600 North Pine Island Rd, Ste 500

Plantation, FL 33324

Joshua Grabel

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

2415 E. Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Adrianna C DE LA Cruz-Munoz

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.

600 N Pine Island Road, Suite 500

Plantation, FL 33324

Peter David Weinstein

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.

600 N. Pine Island Road, Ste 500

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

#21

#18

#17

#16

#15

#13

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Lien)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Contract)

#3

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (Federal)

1 #8

State Court Other Documents Return of Service

1 #7

State Court Other Documents Standing Order in Civil Cases

1 #6

State Court Other Documents Summons

1 #5

State Court Other Documents Plaintiff Designation of Email Address

1 #4

State Court Other Documents Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT Attachments to Complaint

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED document by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.. Amendment to #15 Answer to Counterclaim . (Mazzara, Justin) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial hearing is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call.Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 9/10/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Stipulation, construed as a motion to continue the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Court finds good cause to continue the Preliminary Pretrial Conference to 9/21/2021 and orders the parties to file a joint Case Management Report by 9/10/2021. The Clerk of Court will re-notice the hearing by separate docket entry. The motion is denied to the extent it seeks any greater or different relief. The parties are reminded that leave of court is required to amend a pleading. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. Any party seeking leave to amend a pleading must file an appropriate motion requesting that relief. Amendment is not afforded as a matter of right. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/2/2021. (CM) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.. (Mazzara, Justin) Modified event code per chambers on 6/2/2021 (LYB). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua Grabel. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Joshua Grabel to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Joshua Grabel must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Joshua Grabel must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/21/2021. (CM) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Grabel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18278051 for $150 by All Defendants. (Weinstein, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to #3 Counterclaim by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.. Related document: #3 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Katerra Construction, LLC.(Mazzara, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Answer and Counterclaim. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc. must respond to the Answer and Counterclaim (Doc. #3) no later than 5/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/28/2021. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc. (Mazzara, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified event code on 4/28/2021 (LYB). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/22/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call.Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 6/1/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Mazzara, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Civil Action Order by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc.. (Mazzara, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/13/2021. (LYB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LYB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0304-JLB-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT (filed in state court) against Katerra Construction, LLC filed by Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LYB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Katerra Construction, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Autumn Lake Recreation Association, Inc. by Katerra Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Contract), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Lien))(Rosenberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Katerra Construction, LLC. (Rosenberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit Court (Lee County), case number 21-CA-001768 filed in State Court on 3/16/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18124159 filed by Katerra Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Attachments to Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Plaintiff Designation of Email Address, #6 Summons, #7 Standing Order in Civil Cases, #8 Return of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet (Federal))(Rosenberg, Michael) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (LYB). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Construction LLC Jointly Administered under 21-31861. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Rosenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter David Weinstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Grabel