This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:23:30 (UTC).

Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC v. Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Healthcare Ventures of Ohio, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04901

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gardens ta Celina Operating Company LLC

Brookview Operating Company LLC

Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company LLCCompany

Autumn Court Operating Company LLC, et al.

Oak Grove Manor Operating Company LLC

Dublin Convalarium Operating Company LLC

Gardens at St Henry Operating Company LLC

Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company LLC

Gardens at Paulding Operating Company LLC

Heatherdowns Operating Company LLC

McCrea Operating Company LLC

First Ohio Investors I, LLC

Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC

Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC

Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC

Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC

HVO Operations Windup, LLC

Defendants

Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC

Paul M Dauerman

Paul M. Dauerman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher B Burch

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 West Broad Street, Suite 2100, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215

Elizabeth E. Cary

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 W. Broad Street, Suite 2100

Columbus, OH 43215

Gary Steven Batke

Attorney at Bailey Cavalieri LLC

10 W Broad Street, 21St Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Patrick M Quinn

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Rick Louis Brunner

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215-4801

Defendant Attorneys

Quintin Franc Lindsmith

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler LLP

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Ali I. Haque

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler, LLP

100 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Reply re #35 Brief by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, First Ohio Investors I, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Respondent's REPLY BRIEF by Paul M. Dauerman, Health Prime One, Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, NH Management Corporation . (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The November 2, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2021. Motions to Amend due by 1/25/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 12/21/2020. Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2021. Primary Expert due by 4/1/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/1/2021. Mediation Deadline: 3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/2/2020. (daf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, First Ohio Investors I, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, HG Property Services Corp., HVO Operations Windup, LLC, Ralph Hazelbaker, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC, Greggory St. Clair. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) BRIEF by Defendants Paul M. Dauerman, Health Prime One, Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, NH Management Corporation. (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) BRIEF by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, First Ohio Investors I, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, HG Property Services Corp., HVO Operations Windup, LLC, Ralph Hazelbaker, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC, Greggory St. Clair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ottawa Police Department Report, #2 Exhibit Dispatch News Article regarding COVID 19 Cases) (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTATION ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 11/25/2020. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/27/2020. (agm) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/9/2020. by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC. (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2020 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Defendants Paul M. Dauerman, Health Prime One, Inc., Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, NH Management Corporation. (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants and by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC. (Batke, Gary) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Defendants Paul M. Dauerman, Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal in Federal Court, #2 Exhibit Praecipe) (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul M. Dauerman, Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, filed by Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Defendants Paul M. Dauerman, Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental for Cases Removed from State Court) (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Paul Dauerman by Defendants Paul M. Dauerman, Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gardens at Celina Operating Company, LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company, LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company, LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company, LLC, Brookview Operating Company, LLC, Gardens at St. Henry Operating Company, LLC, Autumn Court Operating Company, LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company, LLC, McCrea Operating Company, LLC, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B Burch for Plaintiffs Autumn Court Operating Company LLC, et al., Brookview Operating Company LLC, Columbus Alzheimers Operating Company LLCCompany, Cridersville Skilled Nursing Facility Operating Company LLC, Dublin Convalarium Operating Company LLC, Gardens at Paulding Operating Company LLC, Gardens at St Henry Operating Company LLC, Gardens ta Celina Operating Company LLC, Heatherdowns Operating Company LLC, McCrea Operating Company LLC, Oak Grove Manor Operating Company LLC (Burch, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER SETTING 65.1 Status Conference for 9/22/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley in his virtual courtroom. GoToMeeting 1-646-749-3112, Access Code 347-407-869. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/18/2020. (cw) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Franklin County, Ohio, case number 20CV006124 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7664116), filed by Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC, Paul M Dauerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quintin F. Lindsmith Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ali I. Haque Esq.