This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2019 at 07:03:19 (UTC).

Autonomous Municipality of San Juan v. Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico

Case Summary

On 05/19/2019 Autonomous Municipality of San Juan filed an Other lawsuit against Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, Laura Taylor Swain and Judith G. Dein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01474

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Judith G. Dein

Presiding Judges

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Autonomous Municipality of San Juan

Defendant

Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico

Interested Party

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raul S. Mariani-Franco

Attorney at Mariani Franco Law Office

Po Box 9022864

San Juan, PR 00902-2864

Leandro F. Delgado

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP.

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Julissa Reynoso

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Michael A. Fernandez

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Marcelo M. Blackburn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Ave.

New York, NY 10166-4193

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Perez-Refojos

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Hadassa R. Waxman

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Guy Brenner

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20004

Lucy C. Wolf

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02100-2600

Carla Garcia-Benitez

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Martin J. Bienenstock

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER CONFIRMING DEADLINES re #23 Order, #26 Order. USA's Answer to the complaint due by 8/12/2019. FOMB's Motion to dismiss due by 8/9/2019. The Municipality of San Juan shall have until 8/9/2019 to move for limiteddiscovery as to the issue of the Oversight Board being a federal entity. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 07/16/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#42

(#42) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein for general pretrial management. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 07/12/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#39

(#39) Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Reassign this action to the Commonwealth Title III Case filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Reynoso, Julissa) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit title (gmm). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

36 #2

Exhibit B

36 #1

Exhibit A

#36

(#36) MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#26

(#43) ORDER CONFIRMING DEADLINES re #23 Order, #26 Order. USA's Answer to the complaint due by 8/12/2019. FOMB's Motion to dismiss due by 8/9/2019. The Municipality of San Juan shall have until 8/9/2019 to move for limiteddiscovery as to the issue of the Oversight Board being a federal entity. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 07/16/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#23

(#43) ORDER CONFIRMING DEADLINES re #23 Order, #26 Order. USA's Answer to the complaint due by 8/12/2019. FOMB's Motion to dismiss due by 8/9/2019. The Municipality of San Juan shall have until 8/9/2019 to move for limiteddiscovery as to the issue of the Oversight Board being a federal entity. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 07/16/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#16

(#40) ORDER: As per Local Rule 3A this action is hereby transferred to U.S. District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, who presides over the Commonwealth's Title III case (Case No. 17-bk-3283 (LTS)(D.P.R.). This will advance the fair, efficient, and timely disposition of this action and further the efficient performance of the business of the Court. Judge Swain has agreed to this transfer and this case shall continue under the current case number and docketing. The alternate ground to transfer this action as a related case pursuant to PROMESA 306(d)(3) (Docket No. #16 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/12/2019.(MET) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: An initial scheduling conference is hereby set for Wednesday, June 12, 2019 at 3:30 pm inCourtroom 6 of the Jose V. Toledo Courthouse in Old San Juan. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019.(LE) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #6 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019. (ft) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

4 #1

Summons in a Civil Action

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER CONFIRMING DEADLINES re #23 Order, #26 Order. USA's Answer to the complaint due by 8/12/2019. FOMB's Motion to dismiss due by 8/9/2019. The Municipality of San Juan shall have until 8/9/2019 to move for limiteddiscovery as to the issue of the Oversight Board being a federal entity. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 07/16/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein for general pretrial management. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 07/12/2019.(ct) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#41) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket no. 40), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Laura Taylor Swain, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019. (nat) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER: As per Local Rule 3A this action is hereby transferred to U.S. District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, who presides over the Commonwealth's Title III case (Case No. 17-bk-3283 (LTS)(D.P.R.). This will advance the fair, efficient, and timely disposition of this action and further the efficient performance of the business of the Court. Judge Swain has agreed to this transfer and this case shall continue under the current case number and docketing. The alternate ground to transfer this action as a related case pursuant to PROMESA 306(d)(3) (Docket No. #16 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/12/2019.(MET) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Reassign this action to the Commonwealth Title III Case filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Reynoso, Julissa) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit title (gmm). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) REPLY to Response to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Section 306 or, in the Alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Re: #36 MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Reynoso, Julissa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION to transfer case Civil Proceeding Pursuant to PROMESA Sec 306 or, in the alternative, Pursuant to Local Rule 3A. filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Transcript of initial scheduling conference held on 06/12/2019, before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Evilys E. Carrion, Evilys_Carrion@prd.uscourts.gov. Telephone number 787.772.3377. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2019. (eec) (Entered: 06/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico for proceedings held on 6/12/2019 before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi.. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to allow Marcelo Blackburn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445375) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***FILED IN ERROR-MISSING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** Motion to allow Hadassa R. Waxman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6445182) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 6/10/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: An initial scheduling conference is hereby set for Wednesday, June 12, 2019 at 3:30 pm inCourtroom 6 of the Jose V. Toledo Courthouse in Old San Juan. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/10/2019.(LE) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #6 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019. (ft) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. See attached. The Clerk will assign the case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/7/2019.(LMR) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6411708.), filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. Service due by 8/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mariani-Franco, Raul) (Entered: 05/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less