This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:59:26 (UTC).

Auto Telematics Ltd. v. United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Auto Telematics Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00474

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto Telematics Ltd.

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J. Wright

Karl Anthony Rupp

Steven E. Tiller

Gregory Stone

Michael B. Angelovich

Nicholas Andrew Wyss

Shawn A. Latchford

Anthony K. Bruster

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Michael T. Zoppo

W. Thomas Jacks

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED CHANGE OF DEADLINE by United Services Automobile Association re #1 Complaint,, (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#15

(#15) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Thomas Jacks on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Jacks, W.) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T. Zoppo on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory Stone for Auto Telematics Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto Telematics Ltd.. United Services Automobile Association served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony K. Bruster for Gregory Stone ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16049653) by on behalf of Auto Telematics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 8 - 879 Claim Chart

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 369 Claim Chart

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 487 Claim Chart

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 271 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - '369 Patent

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - '487 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - '271 Patent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Form AO120

#1

(#16) NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED CHANGE OF DEADLINE by United Services Automobile Association re #1 Complaint,, (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: United Services Automobile Association answer due 7/18/2022. (zv) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED CHANGE OF DEADLINE by United Services Automobile Association re #1 Complaint,, (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Thomas Jacks on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Jacks, W.) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T. Zoppo on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven E. Tiller for Auto Telematics Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sv) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory Stone for Auto Telematics Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto Telematics Ltd.. United Services Automobile Association served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony K. Bruster for Gregory Stone ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16049653) by on behalf of Auto Telematics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony K. Bruster on Behalf of Steven Tiller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16039309) by on behalf of Auto Telematics Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Auto Telematics Ltd. for attorney GREGORY M. STONE. (zv) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Auto Telematics Ltd. for attorney STEVEN E. TILLER. (zv) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Association. (zv) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto Telematics. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Auto Telematics. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16020539), filed by Auto Telematics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Form AO120, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - '271 Patent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - '487 Patent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - '369 Patent, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - '879 Patent, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 271 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 487 Claim Chart, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 369 Claim Chart, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - 879 Claim Chart)(Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less