This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:45:01 (UTC).

Auto-Owners Insurance v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Auto-Owners Insurance filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Stanley Black Decker, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Delton Grussing

Ruth Grussing

Defendants

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Menard, Inc.

LG Chem Ltd.

Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Sherlock

Kevin A Velasquez

Defendant Attorneys

Anju Suresh

Russell S Ponessa

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Affidavit of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Velasquez on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 03/20/2022)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Menard, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Auto-Owners Insurance, a/s/o Ruth Grussing and Delton Grussing. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation,. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Menard, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Menard, Inc. answer due 4/4/2022; Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. answer due 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/21/2022.(JLB) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LG Chem Ltd., Menard, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc.. filed by Auto-Owners Insurance, Delton Grussing, Ruth Grussing. No summons requested. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Auto-Owners Insurance. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#12

(#12) Menard, Inc.'s ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Menard, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Menard, Inc.'s ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Menard, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Auto-Owners Insurance. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LG Chem Ltd., Menard, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc.. filed by Auto-Owners Insurance, Delton Grussing, Ruth Grussing. No summons requested. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Menard, Inc. answer due 4/4/2022; Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. answer due 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/21/2022.(JLB) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Menard, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation,. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Menard, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Auto-Owners Insurance, a/s/o Ruth Grussing and Delton Grussing. (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Velasquez on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance. (Velasquez, Kevin) (Entered: 03/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-664 (ECT/LIB). (KNK) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Pope, Eighth Judicial District, case number N/A (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9384342) filed by Menard, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Ponessa, Russell) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less