This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 11:13:49 (UTC).

Autin v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 Autin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Autin

Defendants

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

K&B Louisiana Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey A Cheek

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Pourciau Law Firm

2200 Veterans Memorial Blvd, Suite 210

Kenner, LA 70062

Jeanne Louise St. Romain

Attorney at Morris Bart, LLC

601 Poydras St., 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Mindy Brickman

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney, LLP

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Oscar M. Gwin, IV

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney

601 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130-6078

Christy L. McMannen

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney, LLP

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130-6078

Leila A. D'Aquin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163-3200

John W. Sinnott

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Claire A. Noonan

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Carlos A Benach

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kim E. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meera Unnithan Sossamon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan D Lewis

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4040

New Orleans, LA 70139

Jeffrey J Siemann

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.

701 Poydras St., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4040

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#22

(#22) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 20 Order on Motion for Oral Argument. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Christine Autin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#19

(#19) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 15 Order on Motion to Continue, 17 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 13 Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

18 #4

Exhibit 4

#12

(#20) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Oral Argument at this time. Should the court later determine that oral argument is necessary, a separate order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Bridget B. Truxillo and Rubi L. Brown who are Co-Counsel for party Christine Autin. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit B -- Part 4

1 #4

Exhibit B -- Part 3

1 #3

Exhibit B -- Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit B -- Part 1

1 #1

Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 20 Order on Motion for Oral Argument. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Christine Autin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Oral Argument at this time. Should the court later determine that oral argument is necessary, a separate order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 15 Order on Motion to Continue, 17 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 13 Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(KAH) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. R. Doc. 16-1 and attachments shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaitniff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION to Stay Status Report Deadline. In light of the pending Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 8), the Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 is CANCELLED and no Status Report is required to be filed at this time. Upon resolution of the #8 Motion to Remand, the parties shall contact chambers at (225) 389-3602 to reschedule the conference, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to [8-1] Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (SWE) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Emergency MOTION to Remand by Christine Autin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD# 2 Motion For Leave, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission,STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD # 5 Request for Oral Arguments, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-2, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Attachment 1 replaced and 8-2 and 8-5 removed on 5/30/2019 in accordance with RD 13) (SWE). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Johnson & Johnson's answer due 5/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Bridget B. Truxillo and Rubi L. Brown who are Co-Counsel for party Christine Autin. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-671445. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1930166), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.