This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 14:19:42 (UTC).

AuthWallet, LLC v. Citigroup Inc.

Case Summary

On April, 13, 2021, AuthWallet, LLC (“Wallet” or “Plaintiff”), represented by William P. Ramey, III of Ramey Schwaller, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Citigroup, Inc., (“Citi” or “Defendant”), seeking a judgement, treble damages with permanent injunction and enjoinment for allegedly unlawfully infringing system and method for applying stored value to financial transaction. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas with Judge Alfred H. Bennett presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff asserted that “Wallet owns the ‘852 patent by assignment. On March 22, 2016, U.S. Patent No. 9,292,852 (“the ’852 Patent or “Patent in Suit”) entitled “System and Method for Applying Stored Value to a Financial Transaction” was duly and legally issued by the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. The ‘852 patent relates to novel and improved methods and systems for processing financial transaction data.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Citi maintains, operates, and administers online platforms, products and services that facilitate financial transaction data processing that infringes one or more claims of the ‘852 patent, including one or more of claims 1-40, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Defendant put the inventions claimed by the ‘852 Patent into service (i.e., used them); but for Defendant’s actions, the claimed- inventions embodiments involving Defendant’s products and services would never have been put into service. Defendant’s acts complained of herein caused those claimed-invention embodiments as a whole to perform, and Defendant’s procurement of monetary and commercial benefit from it”. “Citi has and continues to induce infringement. Citi has actively encouraged or instructed others such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–18 of the ‘852 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Citi has known or should have known of the ‘852 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of issuance of the patent.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Citi has and continues to contributorily infringe. Citi has actively encouraged or instructed others and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services and related services such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–18 of the ‘852 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Citi has known or should have known of the ‘852 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of issuance of the patent. Citi has caused and will continue to cause Wallet damage by direct and indirect infringement of (including inducing infringement of) the claims of the ‘852 patent.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of ‘852 Patent by the Defendant. 

 

In its prayer for relief the Plaintiff has requested the court to enter judgment that the Defendant has infringed the claims of the ‘852 patent through Citi payment links, award Wallet damages in an amount sufficient to compensate it for Defendant’s infringement of the ‘852 patent in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty or lost profits, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs under 35 U.S.C. § 284, declare Defendant’s infringement to be wilful and treble the damages, including attorneys’ fees, expenses, and costs incurred in this action and an increase in the damage award pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284,  a decree addressing future infringement and award Wallet such other and further relief as this Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01203

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AuthWallet, LLC

Defendants

Citigroup Inc.

Citibank N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd, Ste 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit US929285

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Complaint

#7

7 #1

Exhibit US9292852

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Citibank N.A. filed by AuthWallet, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by AuthWallet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US9292852)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Citigroup Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to AuthWallet, LLC, filed.(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE AO 120 by AuthWallet, LLC, filed. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Citigroup Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26268014) filed by AuthWallet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US929285, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III