This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 07:18:44 (UTC).

Austrel v. TransAm Trucking Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Austrel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TransAm Trucking Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00770

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Austrel

Defendants

TransAm Trucking Inc

Laquite Monete Thomas

RLI Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy L Abel

Attorney at Abel Law Firm

900 Ne 63Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Defendant Attorneys

C Eric Shephard

Attorney at Fellers Snider Blankenship Bailey & Tippens-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8820

Greg A Castro

Attorney at Fellers Snider Blankenship Bailey & Tippens-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8820

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Perry Sibenaller

9 #2

Exhibit 2 - TransAm Answer

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - TransAm Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Perry Sibenaller)(Shephard, C) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of RLI Insurance Company (Shephard, C) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of RLI Insurance Company (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by TransAm Trucking Inc.(Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abel, Timothy) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TransAm Trucking Inc . (Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of TransAm Trucking Inc (Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service on RLI

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service on TransAm

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summonses

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - TransAm Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Perry Sibenaller)(Shephard, C) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of RLI Insurance Company (Shephard, C) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of RLI Insurance Company (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by TransAm Trucking Inc.(Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abel, Timothy) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TransAm Trucking Inc . (Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg A Castro on behalf of TransAm Trucking Inc (Castro, Greg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of TransAm Trucking Inc (Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3212161. (Shephard, C) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Blaine County, case number CJ-2020-36 filed by TransAm Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summonses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service on TransAm, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service on RLI, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less