This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2021 at 07:01:32 (UTC).

Austin v. N3 LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2021 Austin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against N3 LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01354

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendon Austin

Defendants

N3 LLC doing business as N3 Results

Accenture LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell Lloyd Feldman

Attorney at Feldman Legal Group

1201 Peachtree Street N#, 2Nd Floor, 30361

Atlanta, GA 33625

Defendant Attorneys

Noelle A. Abastillas

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP - ATL

Suite 2800, 1100 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4528

Yendelela N Holston

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kathleen Brooke Barton

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP - ATL

Suite 2800, 1100 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4528

Allegra J. Lawrence

Attorney at Lawrence & Bundy, LLC-Atl

Suite 1650, 1180 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Katherine Kendricks

Attorney at Lawrence & Bundy, LLC-Atl

Suite 1650, 1180 West Peachtree St., Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

#22

#21

#20

#18

5 #3

Exhibit Consent to join Harvey Wooten

5 #2

Exhibit consent to join Tameka Holmes

5 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join Raynaldo Hinton

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Williams Pro Hac Vice.by Kendon Austin. (Feldman, Mitchell) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPLICATION for Admission of Joan B. Tucker Fife Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11001875).by Accenture LLP. (Lawrence, Allegra) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPLICATION for Admission of Tiana E. Pequette Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11001841).by Accenture LLP. (Lawrence, Allegra) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Lee Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10991757). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Lee Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10991757).by Kendon Austin. (Feldman, Mitchell) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Kendon Austin. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #22 Certificate of Interested Persons, #20 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by N3 LLC. (Holston, Yendelela) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Noelle A. Abastillas on behalf of N3 LLC (Abastillas, Noelle) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to join collective action by Kendon Austin re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Devane-Jones, #2 Exhibit Consent Phillips)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to join collective action by Kendon Austin re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CONSENT TO JOIN FORM MOORE, G)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to join collective action by Kendon Austin re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Wise, J)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to join collective action by Kendon Austin re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Tubman, #2 Exhibit Consent of Kavanagh)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Kendon Austin of Filing Consent to Join (Stanley) (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to join collective action by Kendon Austin re #1 Complaint, Collective Action FLSA Section 216b (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Raynaldo Hinton, #2 Exhibit consent to join Tameka Holmes, #3 Exhibit Consent to join Harvey Wooten, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join Billy Young)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Accenture LLP. (eop) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to N3 LLC. (eop) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kendon Austin. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10876236) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N3 INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Accenture, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Lloyd Feldman