This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2021 at 08:39:15 (UTC).

Austin v. Great Northern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Austin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great Northern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01822

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Austin

Defendant

Great Northern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Scott Perry

Attorney at English Law Group PLLC

12222 Merit Tower, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75251

Jay C English

Attorney at English Law Group PLLC

12222 Merit Drive, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew Todd Hepworth

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

Suite 3100, 1717 Main St

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2021) (svc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 2/6/2023 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2021. Motions due by 8/15/2022. Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 1/9/2023. Status Report due by 12/28/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2021) (svc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 9/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/30/2021) (svc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

1 #10

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #9

Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D

1 #7

Exhibit(s) C

1 #6

Exhibit(s) B

1 #5

Exhibit(s) A-4

1 #4

Exhibit(s) A-3

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A-2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A-1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12113792) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) B, #7 Exhibit(s) C, #8 Exhibit(s) D, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/1/2022. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2021) (svc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 2/6/2023 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2021. Motions due by 8/15/2022. Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 1/9/2023. Status Report due by 12/28/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/29/2021) (svc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 9/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/30/2021) (svc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12113792) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) B, #7 Exhibit(s) C, #8 Exhibit(s) D, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hepworth, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Northern Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia G Curran