This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2020 at 08:26:53 (UTC).

Austin v. City and County of Honolulu

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Austin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against City and County of Honolulu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and DERRICK K. WATSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00630

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Austin

Defendants

Other Doe Entities 1-10

City and County of Honolulu

John and Jane Does 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn A. Luiz

841 Bishop Street, Suite 200, 538-0800, Fax: 524-0010

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Mitsuko Takahashi

Attorney at Department of the Corporation Counsel

530 South King Street, Room 110

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Takahashi, Mitsuko) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

9 #2

Certificate of Service

9 #1

Demand for Jury Trial

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Takahashi, Mitsuko) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Austin. City and County of Honolulu served on 12/3/2019. (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

6 #1

Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Takahashi, Mitsuko) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • (#11) NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00630 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent Election Form (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Takahashi, Mitsuko) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent Election Form (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Austin. City and County of Honolulu served on 12/3/2019. (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00630 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2294302.), filed by Sonya Austin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less